Chiang v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Liu-Kuen Chiang
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and ProCollect, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00047
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The construed motion for extension of time #9 is granted. Defendant ProCollect shall have up to and including 7/24/2019 within which to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/26/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
June 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #9 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Procollect to Answer. (TJZ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Procollect, Inc. to Answer First by Liu-Kuen Chiang. (Gabelman, Richard) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (TJZ).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC time to answer is extended to 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/13/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liu-Kuen Chiang via Certified Mail to ProCollect, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Gabelman, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liu-Kuen Chiang via Certified Mail to Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Gabelman, Richard)
June 11, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #5 Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond. (TJZ)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, ProCollect, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
April 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4335184), filed by Liu-Kuen Chiang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for ProCollect, #3 Summons for Equifax)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiang v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProCollect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liu-Kuen Chiang
Represented By: Richard P. Gabelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?