Hutton v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.

Plaintiff: Janet Lynn Hutton
Defendant: Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc. and Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00048
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: That the following procedure be used to address discovery disputes:1. Parties shall first meet and/or confer in good faith and attempt to resolve discovery disputes between themselves, without judicial intervention;2. If the parties are unable to resolve a dispute after conferring directly, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by calling the undersigned's chambers to schedule an informal telephone conference; and,3. If, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their discovery impasse after informal telephone conference, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court. Written motions regarding discovery shall include the certification required by Civil Rule 37(a)(1) and Local Rule of Civil Practice 37.1, if applicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 7/1/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR DOCKET CALL held on 6/19/2019 before Judge William O. Bertelsman: Parties present as noted. IT IS ORDERED that the Court adopts the parties' Joint Report of Parties Planning Meeting #10 as follows: 1) All written discovery shall be completed on or before May 4, 2020. All fact discovery shall be completed on or before June 1, 2020 with joint or separate status reports due the same date. 2) On or before July 2, 2020, plaintiff shall disclose expert witnesses as required by Rule 26(a)(2). On or before September 2, 2020, defendant shall disclose expert witnesses as required by Rule 26(a)(2). 3) On or before February 3, 2020, the parties shall amend pleadings. 4) Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before November 2, 2020. Although documents must now be filed electronically with the Court Clerk, a PAPER court courtesy copy shall be provided to CHAMBERS within 48 hours of the filing of the brief or memorandum in support of any motion, where such brief or memorandum (including any attached exhibits) exceeds 10 pages. (Court Reporter LISA WIESMAN.) (ECO)cc: COR
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Howmedica Osteonics Corp..(Cross, Jacqueline)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janet Lynn Hutton. (Schloemer, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cross, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: that said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY, JUNE 19, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M., to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom before Judge William O. Bertelsman. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/23/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp..(Cross, Jacqueline)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: That Howmedica Osteonics Corp. is hereby substituted fordefendant, Stryker Corporation, in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff's claims against Stryker Corporation are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/24/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
April 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Substitution of Parties by Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc. (TJZ)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Substitution of Parties by Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc.. (Cross, Jacqueline)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc... (Cross, Jacqueline)
April 16, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jacqueline Cross. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c).. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00445. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4336494), filed by Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutton v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Jacqueline Brittany Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Jacqueline Brittany Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Lynn Hutton
Represented By: Brandy Kathleen Lawrence
Represented By: Douglas B. Schloemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?