Bell et al v. Kokosing Industrial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Bell and Cindy Wilder Bell
Defendant: ATC Group Services LLC, Kokosing Industrial, Inc., City of Cincinnati, Ohio, ATC Associates, Ashcraft Sand & Gravel Company, Inc. and The Metropolitan Sewer District of Greater Cincinnati
Case Number: 2:2019cv00053
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert Johnson. #11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kokosing Industrial, Inc. Partial has been filed by Kokosing Industrial, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TJZ)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Richard Rinear. #9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Ashcraft Sand & Gravel Company, Inc. has been filed by Ashcraft Sand & Gravel Co., Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TJZ)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of Cincinnati, Ohio, The Metropolitan Sewer District of Greater Cincinnati , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by City of Cincinnati, Ohio, The Metropolitan Sewer District of Greater Cincinnati (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Defendants City of Cincinnati and Metropolitan Sewer District of Greater Cincinnati in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint for Monetary Damages, Declaratory Judgment, and Injunctive Relief, #2 Declaration of Pat Arnette, #3 Proposed Order)(Spitzig, Erica)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kokosing Industrial, Inc. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kokosing Industrial, Inc. Partial (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Robert)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashcraft Sand & Gravel Company, Inc.. (Rinear, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Ashcraft Sand & Gravel Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rinear, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by ATC Group Services LLC. (McConnell, Vic)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by City of Cincinnati, Ohio, The Metropolitan Sewer District of Greater Cincinnati. (Spitzig, Erica)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kokosing Industrial, Inc.. (Kolesar, Andrew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by City of Cincinnati, Ohio, The Metropolitan Sewer District of Greater Cincinnati. (Pieczonka, Nicholas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kokosing Industrial, Inc.. (Johnson, Robert)
April 29, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Monetary Damages, Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4346186), filed by David Bell, Cindy Wilder Bell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Kokosing Industrial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Group Services LLC
Represented By: Vic L. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kokosing Industrial, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Johnson
Represented By: Andrew L. Kolesar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cincinnati, Ohio
Represented By: Erica M. Spitzig
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Associates
Represented By: Vic L. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashcraft Sand & Gravel Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Rinear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Metropolitan Sewer District of Greater Cincinnati
Represented By: Erica M. Spitzig
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bell
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Shipp
Represented By: Scott A. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Wilder Bell
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Shipp
Represented By: Scott A. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?