Adams v. Unum Group Corporation

Plaintiff: William R. Adams
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00055
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial disclosures due by 6/21/19. 2. Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 7/22/19. 3. Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due from Plaintiff by 1/31/2020 and from Defendants by 3/1/2020. 4. All Discovery to be completed by 4/1/2020. 5. Status Report due by 4/1/2020. 6. Dispositive or Daubert Motions due by 5/25/2020. 7. A courtesy copy of briefs and memoranda in support of motions must be provided to Chambers w/in 48 hours of electronic filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/7/2019.(LST)cc: COR
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Parry, Ronald)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Within 10 days of the date of entry of this Order, parties to file a joint supplement to their 26(f) Report disclosing the full scope of information required by the Court's prior order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/5/2019.(LST)cc: COR
May 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge David L. Bunning for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (LST)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Parry, Ronald)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT; 1)Parties to meet w/in 21 days to discuss nature/basis of claims and defenses and possibility for a prompt settlement, to make or arrange for the disclosures required and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2)10 days thereafter, parties to file a Joint Status Report containing: (a) proposed discovery plan; (b) parties estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; (c) parties belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; (d) parties' estimate as the probable length of trial; (e) whether the parties consent to the presiding magistrate judge for all purposes; 3)Should parties find that a joint report is not possible, parties to file individual reports which the Court will entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(LST)cc: COR
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Unum Group Corporation.(Turner, Ann)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
May 1, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Unum Group Corporation. (ECO)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00458. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4349113), filed by Unum Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Unum Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Adams
Represented By: Ronald R. Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation
Represented By: Ann Michelle Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?