Brewer v. Nagel et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Brewer
Defendant: Major Nagel, Timothy P. Ryan, Jack Conway and Pamela Jo Bondi
Case Number: 2:2019cv00062
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1. Brewer's #9 Motion to Stay is DENIED.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/18/2019. (LST)cc: COR, Phillip Brewer via U.S. Mail
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Phillip Brewer (LST)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Stay of Proceedings by Phillip Brewer, Pro seMotions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Post Marked 6-7-19)(LST)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: 1. Brewer's #3 complaint is dismissed with prejudice. 2. This matter is stricken from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 5/23/2019.(LST)cc: COR, Pro Se Plaintiff via U.S. Mail
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Brewer's #3 complaint is dismissed with prejudice. 2. Matter is stricken from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 5/23/2019.(LST)cc: COR, Pro Se plaintiff via U.S. Mail
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. Brewer's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. 2. Because Brewer has been granted pauper status in this proceeding, the $50.00 administrative fee is waived. District Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, 14. Title 28, Section 1915(b)(1), (2) require a prisoner to pay the $350.00 filing fee as set forth below; 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Brewers name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525)and shall send the Notice and a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution in whichBrewer is confined; 4. Because Brewers inmate account has a de minimis balance, payment of the initial partial filing fee is deferred. For each month hereafter, if the amount in Brewers inmate account exceeds $10.00, his custodian shall deduct from Brewers inmate account an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month and remit that sum to the Clerk of the Court. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire$350.00 filing fee is paid.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 5/22/2019. (LST)cc: COR, Pla via U.S. Mail, EDKY 525 form and order to Warden at Calhoun Correctional Institute
May 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip Brewer (LST)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(LST)
May 20, 2019 Conflict Check run. (LST)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT referred to Judge P SO., filed by Phillip Brewer. Related document: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip Brewer filed by Phillip Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Various Attachments, #2 Envelope - Not Post Marked)(LST)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Phillip Brewer. (LST)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip Brewer, Pro SeMotions referred to P SO. (LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Nagel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Jo Bondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?