Westfield Group Insurance v. General Carpenter Contracting, LLC
Plaintiff: Westfield Group Insurance
Defendant: General Carpenter Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00063
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 Witness List by Westfield Group Insurance. (Mosbaugh, Jason)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Westfield Group Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Westfield Group for Westfield Group Insurance.. (Mosbaugh, Jason)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/31/2020 (TJZ)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith: 1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures due 7/15/2019. 2) First Tier Discovery to be completed by 10/1/2019. 3) Mid-First Tier Discovery Joint Status Report due 8/15/2019. 4) Post-Mediation Joint Status Report due 10/31/2019. 5) Second Tier Discovery: a) Completion of Fact Witness Discovery by 3/31/2020; b) Completion of Expert Witness Discovery by 5/31/2020. 6) Pretrial Motions due by 7/31/2020. 7) Discovery Disputes counsel are reminded to follow the 3-step process set forth in the initial referral order. (Tape #KYED-COV__2-19-CV-63_20190701_112659.) (TJZ)cc: COR
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER:that a telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held on Monday, July 1, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel should connect to the conference call five minutes before the conference is scheduled to begin.( TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 7/1/2019 at 11:30 AM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 06/25/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
June 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (TJZ)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge: This case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/18/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
June 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #9 Notice Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (ECO)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by General Carpenter Contracting, LLC Notice Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Glassman, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (TJZ)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Glassman, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2) Within 10 days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint statusreport containing: a) proposed discovery plan; b) estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of ADR such as mediation; d) estimate as to the probable length of trial; e) whether the parties will consent to the jurisdiction of a MagistrateJudge (Smith) for all further proceedings, including trial. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(TJZ)cc: COR
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by General Carpenter Contracting, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Order, Set Deadlines Defendant's Amended Notice of Removal (Glassman, Thomas)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant shall file an Amended Notice of Removal by 6/12/2019 sufficiently alleging the citizenship of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/29/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
May 22, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Carpenter Contracting, LLC. (ECO)
May 22, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by General Carpenter Contracting, LLC. (Filed as part of State Court Record-Exhibit A in DE #1 ).(ECO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Gallatin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00054. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4365515), filed by General Carpenter Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Group Insurance v. General Carpenter Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Carpenter Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Patricia J. Trombetta
Represented By: Thomas F. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Group Insurance
Represented By: James T. Hart
Represented By: Jason A. Mosbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?