Crosswater Canyon, Inc. et al v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crosswater Canyon, Inc. and Ark Encounter, LLC
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Allied World Assurance Company Holdings GmbH, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, HDI Global Specialty SE and Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00064
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendant Allied World Assurance Company Holdings GmbH by Ark Encounter, LLC, Crosswater Canyon, Inc.. (Stubblefield, Amanda)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (Antaki, Vincent)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc..(Antaki, Vincent)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (Antaki, Vincent)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTof Certain Defendants by Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE. (O'Brien, Edward)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE.(O'Brien, Edward)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER: Defendants shall have up to and including 7/19/2019 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 7/3/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
July 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: #7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for extension of time by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (KRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for extension of time by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (O'Brien, Edward)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ark Encounter, LLC. (Coffaro, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crosswater Canyon, Inc.. (Coffaro, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) This case is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case will revert back to undersigned for final pretrial and trial. 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: 1) Parties attempt to resolve dispute between themselves; 2) Parties shall attempt to resolve disagreement by telephone conference with Mag Judge; 3) if unable to resolve dispute, they may file appropriate motions. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/12/2017.(TJZ)cc: COR
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (TJZ)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4365619), filed by Ark Encounter, LLC, Crosswater Canyon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A-Commercial Property Policy, #2 Ex B-Supplemental Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Allied World US, #5 Summons Allied GmbH, #6 Summons Certain Underwriters, #7 Summons HDI Global, #8 Summons Blackboard, #9 Summons General Security)(TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosswater Canyon, Inc. et al v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: James M. Burd
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: Peter E. Kanaris
Represented By: Cheryl L. Mondi
Represented By: Vincent P. Antaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company Holdings GmbH
Represented By: Peter E. Kanaris
Represented By: Cheryl L. Mondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Represented By: James M. Burd
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: James M. Burd
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Burd
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crosswater Canyon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven C. Coffaro
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Pamela Morgan Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ark Encounter, LLC
Represented By: Steven C. Coffaro
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Pamela Morgan Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?