Hall et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: William Hall and Joyce Hall
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Secretary of Housing & Urban Development, Kentucky Department Of Highways and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00081
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: That the call of this matter at Docket call scheduled for August 21, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. be, and hereby is, cancelled and reset for DOCKET CALL ON WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 25, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/6/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: That the parties' construed Motion to Amend Case Caption #8 is hereby granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute the United States of America for the Secretary of Housing & Urban Development as the named Defendant in the case caption of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 8/2/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
August 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #8 Joint Status Report (ECO)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by counsel for Plaintiff and HUD by Secretary of Housing & Urban Development. (Gentry, Thomas)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY,AUGUST 21, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M., to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/25/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: That Plaintiff's counsel and AUSA Gentry shall confer and file a joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, the same being not later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 7/17/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
July 12, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #5 Notice of Filing Compliance re #4 Order (ECO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Secretary of Housing & Urban Development re #4 Order, Set Deadlines (Attachments: #1 5 15 19 Answer by Ky Trans Cab)(Gentry, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Richard Deters: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #4 Order. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, Richard Deters by US Mail with ECF Registration Form (ECO)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: That the removing defendant file this document within five (5) days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/10/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
June 26, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(TJZ)cc: COR
June 26, 2019 ANSWER to Commonwealth of Kentucky Transportation Cabinet's Crossclaim by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. filed as part of state court record #1 .(TJZ)
June 26, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, NA., filed as part of state court record #1 . (TJZ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bracken Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00054., filed by Secretary of Housing & Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Ex A-State Court Record)(TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Housing & Urban Development
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department Of Highways
Represented By: Richard H. Deters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hall
Represented By: Robert E. Bathalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Hall
Represented By: Robert E. Bathalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?