Qi v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Lian Hui Qi
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00100
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
2 Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lian Hui Qi via Certified Mail to William Barr served on 8/19/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 8/16/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Certified Mail on 8/15/2019; (Attachments: #1 Envelope Post Marked 9-20-19)(LST)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Referral of this matter to the Pro Se Office is rescinded. 2. This matter is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), including the preparation of a report and recommendationon any dispositive motions; 3. In connection with such reference, the said Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold all hearings as may be required, and to rule on non-dispositive motions, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). See Brown v. Wesleys Quaker Maid, Inc., 771 F.2d 952 (6th Cir. 1985). Motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties consent to trial by a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c).. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/2/2019.(LST)cc: COR, Pro Se Plaintiff via U.S. Mail
August 1, 2019 Conflict Check run. (LST)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(LST)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and sent to Pro Se Plaintiff via U.S. Mail (LST)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions... Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(LST)cc: COR, Pro Se Plaintiff via U.S. Mail
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Filing fee received - $ 400, receipt number 5028078 (LST)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 5028078), filed by Lian Hui Qi, Pro Se (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Various Exhibits, #3 Proposed Summons-McAleenan, #4 Proposed Summons - Attorney General, #5 Proposed Summons - AUSA, #6 Envelope Post Marked 7-24-19)(LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qi v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lian Hui Qi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?