Whalen et al v. The Pavilion at Kenton For Nursing and Rehabiltation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Whalen and Mark Whalen
Defendant: Nielk Equities, LLC, Raphael Weinschneider, David Berger, Tracy Johnson-Croom, Wildcat Holding, LLC, The Pavilion at Kenton Property, LLC, The Pavilion at Kenton For Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Rafael Moerman, Yisrael Klein, Chaim Klein, Nechemia Lieberman, Gershon Klein and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 2:2019cv00103
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by David Berger, Chaim Klein, Gershon Klein, Yisrael Klein, Nechemia Lieberman, Rafael Moerman (ECO)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Donald Miller re #16 Pretrial Memorandum, Error: the reply to #8 was incorrectly filed using the event "Pretrial Memorandum." Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of #16 to state, "incorrectly filed." Clerk filed the reply as #17 ; In the future, contact the ECF help desk when assistance is needed to select the correct event. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by David Berger, Chaim Klein, Gershon Klein, Yisrael Klein, Nechemia Lieberman, Rafael Moerman filed by David Berger, Chaim Klein, Gershon Klein, Yisrael Klein, Nechemia Lieberman, Rafael Moerman, The Pavilion at Kenton Property, LLC, Wildcat Holding, LLC. (Filed per QC DE #16 ). (ECO)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 "INCORRECTLY FILED AS PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM" by David Berger, Chaim Klein, Gershon Klein, Yisrael Klein, Nechemia Lieberman, Rafael Moerman, The Pavilion at Kenton Property, LLC, Wildcat Holding, LLCDef Reply In Further Support of Def MTD for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. "Please see docket entry #17 for the CORRECT ENTRY for this document." (Miller, Donald) Modified to add "INCORRECTLY FILED" on 9/10/2019 (ECO).
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by David Berger, Chaim Klein, Gershon Klein, Yisrael Klein, Nechemia Lieberman, Rafael Moerman, #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Nielk Equities, LLC, The Pavilion at Kenton Property, LLC, Wildcat Holding, LLC filed by Mark Whalen, Richard Whalen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Medicare.gov document, #2 Exhibit 2-The Pavilion at Kenton Data, #3 Exhibit 3-Certificate of Authority)(Jamison, Hannah) Modified text to correctly describe exhibits on 8/28/2019 (ECO).
August 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Hannah Jamison re #15 Response to Motion; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit 1,"Exhibit 2, etc." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL by All Defendants Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Miller, Donald)
August 20, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #14 Notice of Filing Removal, re #13 Order (ECO)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendants to file an Amended Notice of Removal correcting deficiencies within five (5) business days from entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/14/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
August 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(TJZ)cc: COR
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Raphael Weinschneider, Administrator of The Pavilion at Kenton for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Tracy Johnson-Croom, Administrator of The Pavilion at Kenton for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by The Pavilion at Kenton For Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC.(TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION and MEMORANDUM to Dismiss Individual Defendants for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by David Berger, Chaim Klein, Gershon Klein, Yisrael Klein, Nechemia Lieberman, Rafael Moerman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Corporate Defendants for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Nielk Equities, LLC, The Pavilion at Kenton Property, LLC, Wildcat Holding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nielk Equities, LLC. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Pavilion at Kenton For Nursing and Rehabiltation, LLC. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Pavilion at Kenton Property, LLC. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wildcat Holding, LLC. (TJZ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-1108. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4432501), filed by Nechemia Lieberman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whalen et al v. The Pavilion at Kenton For Nursing and Rehabiltation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nielk Equities, LLC
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael Weinschneider
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berger
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Johnson-Croom
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildcat Holding, LLC
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pavilion at Kenton Property, LLC
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pavilion at Kenton For Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Moerman
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yisrael Klein
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaim Klein
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nechemia Lieberman
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gershon Klein
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Whalen
Represented By: Hannah R. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Whalen
Represented By: Hannah R. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?