Lillard v. Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc
Plaintiff: Sandra Lillard
Defendant: Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00108
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures on or before October 15, 2019These disclosures should not be filed in the Court record. (2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings on or before November 15, 2019 (3) Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures Deadline for Plaintiff on or before March 30, 2020 Deadline for Defendant on or before April 30, 2020 These reports should not be filed in the Court record. Supplementation of expert information as required by Rule 26(e)(2) will be made in conjunction with Rule 26(a)(3) pretrial disclosures. (4) All Discovery on or before July 31, 2020 (5) Status Report on or before July 31, 2020 (close of discovery) The report should indicate the progress of the case and the status of settlement negotiations, the likelihood of settlement, and the feasibility of alternative dispute resolution, including the parties views on the method of resolution (i.e., mediation, arbitration, settlement conference with the Court, summary jury trial, etc.). (6) Dispositive or Daubert Motions on or before August 31, 2020 (7) Copies of Memoranda A courtesy copy of briefs and memoranda in support of motions must be provided to Chambers within 48 hours of electronic filing; said courtesy copy should be in paper form or emailed to Judge Bunnings Chambers in electronic format(KRB)cc: COR
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McGrath, V.)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: that within ten (10) days from the date of this Order, the same being not later than October 15, 2019 (the tenth day being a Sunday, followed by a federal holiday), the parties shall file a joint or separate status report as required by the Courts August 22, 2019 Order (R. 8), or otherwise explain why they cannot comply with said Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/03/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of the entry of this Order, theparties, or, if represented by counsel, through their counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: (a) the proposed discovery plan; (b) the parties estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions (c) the parties belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some formof alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; (d) the parties estimate as to the probable length of trial; and(e) whether the parties will consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge (Smith) for all further proceedings, including trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are attached to this Order and forms signed by all parties counsel should be filed no later than the date counsels joint status report is due. If all parties, by counsel, so consent, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this matter to the appropriate Magistrate Judge without the necessity of further order of the Court. L.R. 73.1(c). (3) Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order or other appropriate Order.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 08/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent form)(KRB)cc: COR
August 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #6 Amended Document, (KRB)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc. (McGrath, V.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit DE Entity Status, #4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal)(McGrath, V.)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: that within ten (10) days, the same being not later than August 29, 2019, Defendant shall file an Amended Notice of Removal addressing this deficiency with regard to its citizenship.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 08/19/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc. (McGrath, V.)
August 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(KRB)cc: COR
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-1007. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4438918), filed by Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. SCR, #3 Exhibit 2. Division of Corporations - Filing, #4 Exhibit 3. SCR NOR)(KRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lillard v. Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lillard
Represented By: John Amos Whatley
Represented By: Matthew W. Stein
Represented By: Rob Astorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave & Buster's of Kentucky, Inc
Represented By: Rachel A. Washburn
Represented By: Lauren R. Nichols
Represented By: V. Brandon McGrath
Represented By: Andrea Lauren Russow Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?