Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. M.S.C. Foods, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Irving Music, Jay-Boy Music Corp., Regent Music Corporation, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, House of Cash, Inc. and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Defendant: Mike Crittendon, M.S.C. Foods, LLC and Mary Crittenden
Case Number: 2:2019cv00120
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: That plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Against All Defendants #8 be, and is hereby, DENIED. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/17/2019. (ECO)cc: COR
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Broadcast Music, Inc., Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Carl Perkins Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Jay-Boy Music Corp., Painted Desert Music Corporation, Regent Music Corporation, Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. OF PROOF OF SERVICE UPON MIKE CRITTENDON (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Mike Crittendon)(Wimberg, April)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Broadcast Music, Inc., Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Carl Perkins Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Jay-Boy Music Corp., Painted Desert Music Corporation, Regent Music Corporation, Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. Against Defendants Mary Crittendon, individually, and M.S.C. Foods, LLC dba Tom's Papa Dino's Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default, #3 Proposed Order)(Wimberg, April)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Broadcast Music, Inc., Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Carl Perkins Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Jay-Boy Music Corp., Painted Desert Music Corporation, Regent Music Corporation, Rondor Music International, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. OF PROOF OF SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Upon Defendants Mary Crittendon and M.S.C. Foods, LLC dba Tom's Papa Dino's)(Wimberg, April)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding cc: form mailed to Copyright Register, SKV (LST)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mary Crittenden, Mike Crittendon, M.S.C. Foods, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (LST)
September 4, 2019 Conflict Check run. (LST)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Mag. Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case to revert back to undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge to conduct all pretrial/status conferences and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine to be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial also to be before the undersigned. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2010. (LST)cc: COR
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc., Painted Desert Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Skidmore Music Company, Inc., Rondor Music International d/b/a Irving Music identifying Vivendi SA, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Vivendi SA (LST)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4455717), filed by Regent Music Corporation, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Jay-Boy Music Corp., Painted Desert Music Corporation, House of Cash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Schedule, #3 Proposed Summons - MSC Foods, #4 Prposed Summons - Mike Crittendon, #5 Proposed Summons - Mary Crittendon)(LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. M.S.C. Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Perkins Music, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Music
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay-Boy Music Corp.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regent Music Corporation
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painted Desert Music Corporation
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broken Arrow Music Corporation
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Crittendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.S.C. Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?