Whitehead v. Alexa Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Whitehead
Defendant: Alexa Enterprises, Inc., Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II and Kevin Ellis
Case Number: 2:2019cv00122
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: that the pro hac vice motion #9 is taken under advisement, pending counsels filing within fourteen (14) days of a supplemental filing correcting the noted deficiencies.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/28/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before the Court is a Joint Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff Steven Whitehead and Defendants Alexa Enterprises, Inc., Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II, and Kevin Ellis. For good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS such motion #8 and stays this matter for a period of 60 days from the date of this Order to allow the parties to engage in private discussions to determine whether this matter can be resolved short of litigation. Included within this stay is the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. In the event the stay is lifted at the end of the 60-day period, Defendants answer or other response to the Complaint shall be due within 14 days of such date.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/23/2019.(KRB)cc: COR
October 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #9 MOTION for Joe P. Leniski, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Whitehead (proposed order submitted) ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4496031) (ECO)
October 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #8 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Alexa Enterprises, Inc., Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II, Kevin Ellis (ECO)
October 18, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Joey P. Leniski, Jr re #9 MOTION for Joe P. Leniski, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Whitehead (proposed order submitted) ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4496031). (ECO)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Joe P. Leniski, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Whitehead (proposed order submitted) ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4496031)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification re KY 83.2, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Suetholz, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Alexa Enterprises, Inc., Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II, Kevin Ellis Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kyle)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER: 1. Defendants shall have up to and including 10/21/19 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/7/2019.(LST)cc: COR
October 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Alexa Enterprises, Inc., Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II, Kevin Ellis (LST)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Alexa Enterprises, Inc., Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II, Kevin Ellis. (Johnson, Kyle)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Joey P. Leniski by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Data and Info and Routing Form - No record of admission)(ECO)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
September 9, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alexa Enterprises, Inc., Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II, Kevin Ellis; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4459661), filed by Steven Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Kevin Ellis, #4 Summons Alexa Enterprises, Inc., #5 Summons Alexa Enterprise Inc. II)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. Alexa Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexa Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexa Enterprises, Inc. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Whitehead
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?