Hollingsworth v. Wendein et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Hollingsworth
Defendant: J. Wendein and Mark Sweeney
Case Number: 2:2019cv00127
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Hollingsworth's request to voluntarily dismiss his case #8 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/7/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR, Timothy Hollingsworth via US Mail
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 WITHDRAW FROM CIVIL ACTION by Timothy Hollingsworth, pro se. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope postmarked 10-1-19)(TJZ)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: 1) Hollingsworth's complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. 2) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment, and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/27/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR, Timothy Hollingsworth via US Mail
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Hollingsworth's complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. 2) This action is STRICKEN from the docket. 3) The Court will enter a corresponding Judgment. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/27/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR, Timothy Hollingsworth via US Mail
September 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Hollingsworth (ECO)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(ECO)
September 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy Hollingsworth, pro se. (ECO)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Hollingsworth, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (ECO)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Timothy Hollingsworth, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Summons Mark Sweeney, #2 Summons J.Wendein, #3 Envelope - no post mark)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollingsworth v. Wendein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wendein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?