Cooper v. Carr et al
Plaintiff: Carl Cooper and Carl Rush Cooper
Defendant: Chief Deputy Ed Butler and Jailer Terry Carr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00150
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #13 Answer to Complaint was an INCORRECT PDF document filed as main document; Attorney has refiled the correct Answer to the Complaint at #14 . No Further action needed by counsel. *SKV* cc: COR (KRB) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (KRB).
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to #3 Complaint to correct a misfiling (counsel inadvertently attached wrong document as Answer) by Ed Butler, Terry Carr.(Nordloh, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCORRECT DOCUMENT Modified on 12/19/2019 (KRB).
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN as to Ed Butler re #9 (KRB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN as to Jailer Terry Carl re #9 (KRB)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ed Butler, Terry Carr; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(KRB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #2 Time Stamped Summons Forms received by US Marshal) (KRB).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: (1) Coopers Motion to Compel #7 is DENIED; (2) The Covington Deputy Clerk shall prepare two Service Packets for service upon Defendants Jailer Terry Carl and the Chief Deputy Ed Butler. These Service Packets shall include: a. a completed summons form; b. the Complaint #3 ; c. the Order granting Cooper In Forma Pauperis status #6 ; d. this Order; and e. a completed USM Form 285. (3) The Covington Deputy Clerk shall send the Service Packet to the United States Marshals Service in Lexington, Kentucky, and note the date of delivery in the docket; (4) The United States Marshals Service shall make arrangements with the appropriate officials at the Kenton County Detention Center to personally serve Defendants Jailer Terry Carl and the Chief Deputy Ed Butler with a Service Packet at theKenton County Detention Center, 3000 Decker Crane Lane, Covington, Kentucky 41017; (5) Cooper must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change to his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case; and (6) If Cooper wishes to seek relief from the Court, he must do so by filing a formal motion sent to the Clerks Office, which includes the case number associated with this action. Every motion Cooper files must include a written certification that he has mailed a copy of it to the defendants or their counsel, with the date of mailing. The Court may disregard letters sent directly to the judges chambers or motions lacking acertificate of service. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/20/2019.(KRB)cc: COR, Carl Cooper via US Mail
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel by Carl Cooper Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Post Marked 11/16/19)(KRB)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: (1) Coopers motion to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED.Section 1915(b)(1) requires a prisoner-plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee for a civil action as set forth below. (2) The financial documentation filed by Cooper indicates that he lacks sufficient income or assets to pay the initial partial filing fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), and payment of such fee is therefore DEFERRED (3) The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Coopers name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) with (a) Coopers name, (b) his inmate registration number, and (c) this case number. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form upon the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Cooper is currently confined and upon the Office of the General Counsel for the Department of Corrections in Frankfort, Kentucky. (4) Each month Coopers custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). (5) Cooper must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change in his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case, and. (6) This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/28/2019.(KRB)cc: COR, Carl Cooper & KCDC w/525 via US Mail Modified on 10/28/2019 (KRB).
October 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #3 Complaint, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Cooper (ECO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(ECO)
October 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Carl Cooper, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope - no post mark)(ECO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Carl Cooper, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Balance History Report)(ECO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Cooper, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Carr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Rush Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy Ed Butler
Represented By: Christopher Scott Nordloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Terry Carr
Represented By: Christopher Scott Nordloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?