Mbaye v. Tucker et al
Plaintiff: Amadou Mbaye
Defendant: Police Micheal Paolucci and Ms. Tucker
Case Number: 2:2019cv00151
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, Not in Custody. Mail sent to Amadou Mbaye re #7 Order, #8 Judgment. (TJZ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, Not in Custody. Mail sent to Amadou Mbaye re #6 Order. (TJZ)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff Amadou Mbaye's complaint #3 is DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE. 2. Judgment is ENTERED in favor of the defendants.3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is nojust cause for delay. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/28/2019.(ECO)cc: COR, Amadou Mbaya via U.S. Mail
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION & ORDER: 1. The Court DISMISSES Amadou Mbaye's complaint #3 with prejudice. 2. This matter is STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/28/2019.(ECO)cc: COR, Amadou Mbaya via U.S. Mail. Modified bold text on 10/28/2019 (ECO).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) The Clerk shall update the docket to reflect Mbaye's current address at Kenosha County Detention Center. 2) The Court GRANTS Mbaye's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #1 . 3) The Court WAIVES payment of the $50.00 administrative fee and the $350.00 filing fee. 4) This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/28/2019. (TJZ)cc: COR, Amadou Mbaya via US Mail
October 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #3 Complaint, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amadou Mbaye (ECO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 INCORRECT Sample Caption Page)(ECO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2019: #2 CORRECT Sample Caption Page) (ECO).
October 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Amadou Mbaye, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Docket Sheet, #2 Envelope no post mark)(ECO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Amadou Mbaye, pro se. (ECO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amadou Mbaye, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mbaye v. Tucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Micheal Paolucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amadou Mbaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?