Conrad v. Lusardi et al
Plaintiff: Antonio J. Conrad
Defendant: John J. Coulter, Michael Lusardi and Daniel Osborne
Case Number: 2:2020cv00049
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
2 Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Antonio J. Conrad, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope post marked 6/1/2020)(ECO)
June 1, 2020 Clerk's Note: Plaintiff called to advise change of address: 1180 Tamarack Circle, Apt. L, Florence, KY 41042. Advised plaintiff to mail letter with updated address. Orders #28 and #30 mailed to current address. (TJZ)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The parties shall complete all pretrial discovery on or before October 2, 2020. 2. The parties shall file any dispositive motions on or before November 2, 2020. Any response shall be filed on or before December 2, 2020. Any reply brief shall be filed on or before January 4, 2021. 3. If a party wishes to modify any aspect of this Order, the party must file a motion. A party wishing to extend any deadline established by this Order must file a motion before the pertinent deadline passes and show good cause for the extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 6/1/2020.(ECO)cc: COR and Antonio J. Conrad by US Mail
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: 1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), this matter is REFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all further pretrial proceedings, including overseeing discovery and preparing proposed findings of fact and recommendations on any dispositive motions. 2. The Clerk of the Court shall ASSIGN this matter to a United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/1/2020.(ECO)cc: CORand Antonio J. Conrad by US Mail
May 29, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Daniel Osborne.(Mando, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Osborne. (Mando, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: 1. Within 14 days from the entry of this Order, defense attorney Jeffrey Mando SHALL file a notice into the record informing the Court whether he will enter an appearance and file an answer on behalf of defendant Daniel Osborne. 2. If Mr. Mando informs the Court that he will enter an appearance and file an answer on behalf of defendant Daniel Osborne, he shall also indicate his time frame for doing so. 3. If Mr. Mando informs the Court that he will not enter an appearance and file an answer on behalf of defendant Daniel Osborne, Mr. Mando shall nevertheless inform the Courtwhether he serves as counsel for the Covington Police Department and, if so, whether the Department possesses a valid forwarding address for Daniel Osborne that could be filed with the Court ex parte and under seal. This information would assist the Court in its efforts to have Daniel Osborne served by the federal marshals so that this case may move forward. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/27/2020.(ECO)cc: COR and Antonio J. Conrad by US Mail Modified bold text on 5/27/2020 (ECO).
May 21, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #22 Summons Returned Unexecuted, #23 USM 285 RETURN of Service re: #8 Order (ECO)
May 20, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by John J. Coulter, Michael Lusardi.(Mando, Jeffrey)
May 12, 2020 Filing 23 USM-285 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of Service via USMS filed by Antonio J. Conrad. Daniel Osborne no longer works for Covington Police Department. (ECO) Modified typo on 5/15/2020 (ECO).
May 12, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted via USMS by Antonio J. Conrad as to Daniel Osborne. Daniel Osborn no longer works for Covington Police Department. (ECO)
May 6, 2020 Clerk's Note: Clerk resent #21 Mail Returned re: #3 Pro Se Information Packet at current address listed on the docket sheet re: #12 Notice of Change of Address. (ECO)
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Antonio J. Conrad re #3 Pro Se Information Packet. (ECO)
April 30, 2020 Clerk's Note: Clerk resent (Mail Returned ( #19 , #20 ) re: #7 General Order 20-03 - Court Operations Related to COVID-19 and #8 Order to Antonio J. Conrad at current address listed on the docket sheet (per #12 Notice of Change of Address).(ECO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Antonio J. Conrad re #8 Order (ECO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Antonio J. Conrad re #7 General Order 20-03 - Court Operations Related to COVID-19 (ECO)
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return of Service-Summons Returned Executed via USMS as to John Coulter served Officer Rachel White on 4/29/2020 filed by Antonio J. Conrad. (ECO)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio J. Conrad via USMS to John J. Coulter served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (ECO)
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return of Service-Summons Returned Executed via USMS as to Michael Lusardi served Officer Rachel White on 4/29/2020 filed by Antonio J. Conrad. (ECO)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio J. Conrad via USMS to Michael Lusardi served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (ECO)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio J. Conrad via USMS to Daniel Osborne served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (ECO)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(ECO)cc: COR and Antonio J. Conrad by US Mail
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Antonio J. Conrad, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope post marked 4/21/2020)(ECO)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - RELEASED. Mail sent to Antonio J. Conrad re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (TJZ)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John J. Coulter, Michael Lusardi, Daniel Osborne,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (ECO)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. A Deputy Clerk shall prepare three "Service Packets" for service upon each of the three Defendants: Michael Lusardi, Daniel Osborne, and John Coulter. Those Service Packets shall include: a. a completed summons form; b. the complaint #1 ; c. this Order; and d. a completed USM Form 285. 2. The Deputy Clerk shall send the Service Packets to the USMS in Lexington, Kentucky, and note the date of delivery in the docket. 3. The USMS shall personally serve one Service Packet upon each of the three namedDefendants Michael Lusardi, Daniel Osborne, and John Coulterat the CovingtonPolice Department at 1 Police Memorial Drive in Covington, Kentucky 41011.4. Within 21 days after being served, the Defendants must answer Conrad's complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. 5. Finally, Conrad must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in his current mailing address. If Conrad fails to do so, the Court will dismiss his case.. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/21/2020.(ECO)cc: COR and Antonio J. Conrad by US Mail
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. Conrads motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is GRANTED. Payment of the $50.00 administrative fee is WAIVED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), Conrad must pay the $350.00 filing fee in the manner set forth below. 2. Payment of an initial partial filing fee is WAIVED. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Conrad's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form [E.D. Ky. 525 Form] with: (a) Conrad's name, (b) his inmate registration number, and (c) this case number. The Clerk shall then send a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form to the Warden of the institution in which Conrad is currently confined. 4. Conrad's custodian shall send the Clerk of this Court a payment each month out of Conrad's inmate trust fund account. This payment should be in an amount equal to 20% of Conrads income from the preceding month. That said, the custodian shall onlysend a monthly payment if the amount in Conrads account exceeds $10.00.Ultimately, the custodian shall continue the monthly payments until Conrads entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2).5. Conrad must also keep the Clerk of this Court apprised of any change in his address. If Conrad fails to notify the Clerk Office's, in writing, of a change in his address, the Court may dismiss his case. 6. This matter now stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915Aand 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/9/2020. (ECO)cc: COR and Antonio J. Conrad by US Mail w/copy of Order, EDKY 535 Form to Warden/Jailer Kenton County Detention Center
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER 20-03 - COURT OPERATIONS RELATED TO COVID-19: 1. General Order does not apply to ongoing trials; 2. Continuation of civil & criminal trials per General Order 20-03 extended to civil & criminal trials set to begin 5/1/2020. 3. hearings in criminal cases through 5/1/2020, motion hearings, change of plea, & sentencings CONTINUED GENERALLY, subject to further orders. 4. Initial appearances & detention hearings proceed via remote attendance to extent possible; appearances by summons cont. after 5/1/20. 5. Except TROs, prel. inj., & emergency matters, in-person hrgs in civil cases through 5/1/2020 CONTINUED GENERALLY. Assigned judge may proceed by means not requiring personal appearance. 6. Absent exceptional circumstances, hrgs in emergency matters shall be conducted by means not requiring in-person attendance. 7. If a detention facility informs USM inmate is ill, inmate shall not be brought to Courthouse. 8. Naturalization ceremonies through 5/1/2020 are CONTINUED GENERALLY. 9. Settlement conferences through 5/1/2020 are CONTINUED GENERALLY. 10. Misd. & petty offense dockets through 5/1/2020 CONTINUED GENERALLY. 11. For complaints filed per False Claims Act, which remain under seal, US granted add'l 60 days to intervene or notify Court that it declines. 12. Courts remain open. Eff. 3/24/2020-5/1/2020 Courthouse open Mon-Fri 10 AM-2 PM. 13. Visitor restrictions apply & will be screened. 14. Gen. Order 20-02 remains in effect. 15. Court may issue further directives. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/23/2020.(TJZ)cc: COR and Antonio J. Conrad by US Mail Modified on 5/21/2020 (TJZ).
April 8, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint, #5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio J. Conrad (SLG)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antonio J. Conrad, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Account Attachments)(SLG)
April 8, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLG)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio J. Conrad, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 envelope post marked 4/8/2020)(SLG)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(SLG)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED) filed by Antonio J. Conrad, pro se. (Attachments: #1envelope post marked 4/8/2020)(SLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad v. Lusardi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Coulter
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lusardi
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Osborne
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?