Yazid v. Webster et al
Plaintiff: Hanif Yazid
Defendant: Jailer Mike Webster, 2 Ky State Policemen, Jackie Bodenhammer and Ky State Police Dept.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00097
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Yazid's blank motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED without prejudice. 2. The Clerk's Office shall mark the assigned case number on an Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application [Form AO-240] and a Certificate of Inmate Account Form [E.D. Ky. 523 Form] and send those forms to Yazid. 3. If Yazid wishes to continue this action, he must either pay the outstanding $50.00 administrative fee that is applicable to his case or he must properly seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis by (1) having the Certificate of Inmate Account Form fully completed and certified by prison staff, (2) completing the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application, and (3) filing both of these documents with the Court. 4. Yazid must take these steps within 30 days from the entry of this Order or the Courtwill dismiss this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/17/2020.(ECO)cc: COR, FIN and Hanif Yazid by US Mail
August 14, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECO)
July 24, 2020 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Hanif Yazid re #8 Letter : A courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. If you would like a copy of any document previously filed in your record, please send a request to the Office of the Clerk noting the docket entry number for each copy requested. You will receive a response advising you of the total number of pages and the amount of money required to obtain the requested copies. Copies of the documents in your record will require a pre-payment of 50 cents per page. cc: Hanif Yazid by US Mail (TJZ)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Hanif Yazid, pro se. (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 7-21-2020) (TJZ)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(ECO)
July 9, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (STC)
July 9, 2020 Conflict Check run. (STC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:20-cv-00379. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Plt w/ copy of docket sheet
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/9/2020 Dismissing Case. The instant action is ordered to be transferred to the United States DistrictCourt for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for all further proceedings. 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). All future filings should be filed in that court. Should further filings be filed in this Court, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filing to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc: Counsel (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 7/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DLW) [Transferred from kywd on 7/9/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Hanif Yazid. (DLW) [Transferred from kywd on 7/9/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2 Ky State Policemen, Jackie Bodenhammer, Ky State Police Dept., and Mike Webster. Partial Filing fee $350, receipt number L33063913, filed by Hanif Yazid. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Summons Tendered (blank)) (DLW) [Transferred from kywd on 7/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yazid v. Webster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Mike Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Ky State Policemen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Bodenhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ky State Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanif Yazid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?