Diversified Structural Composites, Inc. v. Cell Trees, Inc.
Plaintiff: Diversified Structural Composites, Inc.
Defendant: Cell Trees, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00117
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff Diversified Structural Composite's Motion to Admit Attorney Curtis L. Cornett Pro Hac Vice #6 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/2/2020. (TJZ)cc: COR
August 31, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 MOTION for Curtis L. Cornett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diversified Structural Composites, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4760836) (TJZ)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Curtis L. Cornett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diversified Structural Composites, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4760836)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Curtiss L. Cornett, #2 Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Huenefeld, Alison) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (TJZ).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
August 18, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diversified Structural Composites, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Excel Composites, Plc for Diversified Structural Composites, Inc. (ECO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cell Trees, Inc. ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4751829), filed by Diversified Structural Composites, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Purchase Order, #2 Summons to be Issued, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diversified Structural Composites, Inc. v. Cell Trees, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cell Trees, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversified Structural Composites, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Marcotte Huenefeld
Represented By: Curtis L. Cornett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?