CNC Foundations, Inc. v. Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CNC Foundations, Inc. doing business as Helitech Civil Construction Division, an Illinois corporation
Defendant: North American Speciality Insurance Company, Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc. and KY Covington JRG, LLC
Counter Defendant: CNC Foundations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00118
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by KY Covington JRG, LLC, North American Speciality Insurance Company. (Stubblefield, Amanda)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc.. (Nitardy, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against KY Covington JRG, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against KY Covington JRG, LLC by Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed A141 Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Executed - Exhibit A Design-Build Amendment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Executed Subcontract 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Executed Subcontract 2, #5 Exhibit 5 - 11-1-2019 Notice, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter to Wilson and Coffaro 8-14-20)(Nitardy, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KY Covington JRG, LLC, North American Speciality Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Swiss Re Ltd for North American Speciality Insurance Company.. (Coffaro, Steven)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against CNC Foundations, Inc. by North American Speciality Insurance Company, KY Covington JRG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Contract)(Coffaro, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: that Turnbull-Wahlert shall have up to and including October 13, 2020, to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to CNC Foundations, Inc.s Complaint #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 09/24/2020.(KRB)cc: COR Modified on 9/28/2020 (KRB).
September 22, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #12 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time To Move, Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc. (ECO)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time To Move, Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc.. (Nitardy, Michael) Modified on 9/28/2020 (KRB).
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING by CNC Foundations, Inc. re #3 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service by Leslie Pennington, #2 Affidavit of Service by Leslie Pennington as to, #3 Affidavit of Service By Leslie Pennington, #4 Envelope Post Marked 9-18-20)(KRB)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER:that the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 is hereby granted, the requirements of Local Rule 83.2(a) having now been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 09/14/2020. (KRB)cc: COR Michael E. Wilson with ECF Registration
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Michael E. Wilson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of CM/ECF Training) (KRB)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER:that the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 is hereby taken under advisement pending counsel filing a supplement by September 14, 2020, providing the necessary additional information.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 08/31/2020. (KRB)cc: COR
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CNC Foundations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Court)(ECO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Michael E. Wilson. #1 Complaint, has been filed by CNC Foundations, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
August 19, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #4 MOTION for Michael E. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CNC Foundations, Inc. (ECO)
August 19, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Michael E. Wilson re #4 MOTION for Michael E. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CNC Foundations, Inc.. (ECO)
August 19, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael E. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CNC Foundations, Inc. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt #2013394-PHV Filing Fee -$125)(ECO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KY Covington JRG, LLC, North American Speciality Insurance Company, Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc. ; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail (ECO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 2013394), filed by CNC Foundations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Subcontract Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Bond to Discharge Mechanic's Lien, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to be issued, #5 Letter to the Court, #6 Receipt #2013394 Filing Fee -$400)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNC Foundations, Inc. v. Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven C. Coffaro
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnbull-Wahlert, Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John Sidney Higgins, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Nitardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KY Covington JRG, LLC
Represented By: Steven C. Coffaro
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNC Foundations, Inc. doing business as Helitech Civil Construction Division, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Michael E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CNC Foundations, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?