Schaible v. Janicki et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Schaible
Defendant: Andrezj Janicki and APF Trucking Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00119
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted via Secretary of State. The office served the defendant by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail, return receipt requested, on 8/31/2020. by Melissa Schaible as to Andrezj Janicki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope-Return to Sender - Unclaimed)(ECO)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties shall confer no later than October 27, 2020, to consider the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), and to develop a proposed discovery plan. Such proposed schedule shall be filed no later than November 3, 2020. Upon the filing of the proposed schedule, the Court will review the plan and determine whether a preliminary pretrial conference is needed. If the Court determines that a conference is not necessary, a scheduling order will be issued based upon the plan filed by the parties. If the Court determines that a conference should be held, an order scheduling the same shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 10/13/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: That defendants' motion to dismiss #7 be, and is hereby, DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/9/2020. (ECO)cc: COR
October 9, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #13 Answer to Complaint (ECO)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by APF Trucking Co., Inc., Andrezj Janicki.(Kendall, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: that the following claims are dismissedwithout prejudice: Negligent hiring; Negligent training; Negligent retention; Negligent supervision/safety management and control; Negligent entrustment; Negligence per se; and Gross negligence/punitive damages. All other causes of action shall remain active and pending.Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(A), Defendants shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file their answer to the remaining allegations in the Complaint. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/5/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
October 5, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #11 Proposed Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal without Prejudice by Melissa Schaible (ECO)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal without Prejudice by Melissa Schaible. (Grossman, H.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Schaible via Secretary of State to APF Trucking Co., Inc. served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(ECO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Schaible via Secretary of State to Andrezj Janicki served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(ECO)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by APF Trucking Co., Inc.. (Kendall, Gregory)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by APF Trucking Co., Inc., Andrezj Janicki (Partial) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to APF Trucking Co., Inc. COMPLETED on 8/25/2020. Secretary of State return states This office served the defendant by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail, return receipt requested on, August 25, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(SLG)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued. (ECO)
August 21, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to APF Trucking Co., Inc., Andrezj Janicki; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for defendants APF Trucking Co., Inc. and Andrezj Janick via service thru Secretary of State, with service packet. (ECO)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER:1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4754792) filed by Melissa Schaible. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Andrezj Janicki, #3 Summons APF Trucking Co., Inc.)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaible v. Janicki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrezj Janicki
Represented By: Gregory A. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APF Trucking Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Schaible
Represented By: H. Philip Grossman
Represented By: Abigale Rhodes Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?