Dickerson v. Harjinder et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Renee Dickerson
Defendant: TPT Systems Limited and Jagpal S. Harjinder
Case Number: 2:2020cv00156
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KRB)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stopher, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties shall confer no later than November 24, 2020, to consider the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), and to develop a proposed discovery plan. Such proposed schedule shall be filed no later than December 1, 2020. Upon the filing of the proposed schedule, the Court will review the plan and determine whether a preliminary pretrial conference is needed. If the Court determines that a conference is not necessary, a scheduling order will be issued based upon the plan filed by the parties. If the Court determines that a conference should be held, an order scheduling the same shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/10/2020.(ECO)cc: COR
November 6, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: Answer to Complaint DE #1 Notice of Removal Attachment #2). (ECO)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TPT Systems Limited identifying Corporate Parent Kriska Transportation Group Limited for TPT Systems Limited.. (ECO)
November 6, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by Jagpal S. Harjinder, TPT Systems Limited. (Filed as part of State Court Record DE #1 Attachment #2). (ECO)
November 6, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-1041. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4821486), filed by TPT Systems Limited, Jagpal S. Harjinder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Harjinder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Renee Dickerson
Represented By: Michael P. Cussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPT Systems Limited
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagpal S. Harjinder
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?