Oswald et al v. Beshear
Plaintiff: Jason Oswald, Karen Oswald, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Jim Sandfoss, Jessica Fischer, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Boyers, Brian Boyers, Dr. Jessica Twehues, Craig Twehues, Julianna Works, Greg Works, Rebecca Stidham, Chad Stidham, Maria Lawrence, Eric Lawrence, Rob Keller, Sherry Keller, Kimberly Lucas, Brian Lucas, Caitlin Voelker, Brandon Voelker, Jennifer Clark, Doug Clark, Tammy Noyes, Andrew Noyes, Natalie Ramirez, Howard Ramirez, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Kevin Schappell, Molly Schappell, Danielle Pipes, Chris Pipes, Susan Heitker, Hank Heitker, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Chris Speier, Laura Speier, Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Alexandra Macke and Fred Macke, III
Defendant: Governor Andy Beshear
Case Number: 2:2021cv00096
Filed: August 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
2 Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss by Andy Beshear filed by Doug Clark. (Voelker, Brandon)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: That: (1) defendant's Emergency Motion to Dissolve TRO #14 be, and is hereby, DENIED AS MOOT; (2) plaintiffs' first motion for TRO #10 and proposed order #13 are also DENIED AS MOOT in light of this Court's August 19, 2021 Memorandum Opinion and Order #11 and Temporary Restraining Order #12 . Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/1/2021. (ECO)cc: COR
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: That plaintiffs' First Motion to Continue #25 be, and is hereby, GRANTED. The docket call set in this matterfor Tuesday, October 12, 2021 be, and is hereby, CANCELLED. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/1/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST MOTION to Continue by Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Brian Boyers, Jessica Boyers, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Doug Clark, Jennifer Clark, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Hank Heitker, Susan Heitker, Rob Keller, Sherry Keller, Eric Lawrence, Maria Lawrence, Brian Lucas, Kimberly Lucas, Alexandra Macke, Fred Macke, III, Andrew Noyes, Tammy Noyes, Jason Oswald, Karen Oswald, Chris Pipes, Danielle Pipes, Howard Ramirez, Natalie Ramirez, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Jim Sandfoss, Kevin Schappell, Molly Schappell, Chris Speier, Laura Speier, Chad Stidham, Rebecca Stidham, Craig Twehues, Jessica Twehues, Brandon Voelker, Caitlin Voelker, Greg Works, Julianna Works Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Voelker, Brandon)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER: that said Docket Call be, and hereby is, set for TUESDAY, OCTOBER 12, 2021 AT 1:00 P.M., to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/13/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: that said Docket Call be, and hereby is, set for TUESDAY, OCTOBER 12, 2021 AT 1:00 P.M., to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/10/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Andy Beshear (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - HJR 1, #3 Exhibit B - Return to School Requirements, #4 Exhibit C - Parent Letter, #5 Proposed Order)(Tipton, Laura)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AGREED ORDER: That the following briefing schedule be entered: 1. Defendant shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading in lieu of an Answer by the end of September 10, 2021; 2. Plaintiffs shall file a response to any responsive pleading in lieu of an Answer by the end of October 1, 2021; and 3. Defendant shall file a reply in support of any responsive pleading in lieu of an Answer by the end of October 15, 2021. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/1/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Andy Beshear. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order - Briefing Schedule)(Mayo, Steven)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #20 Joint Status Report re: #19 Order (ECO)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The hearing on a preliminary injunction set for Tuesday, August 24, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. be, and is hereby, CANCELLED. The parties shall confer regarding how this matter should proceed and file a joint status report on or before Friday, September 3, 2021. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 08/23/2021.(SLG)cc: COR
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to #16 Defendant's Notice of Filing (Doc. 16) filed by Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Brian Boyers, Jessica Boyers, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Doug Clark, Jennifer Clark, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Hank Heitker, Susan Heitker, Rob Keller, Sherry Keller, Eric Lawrence, Maria Lawrence, Brian Lucas, Kimberly Lucas, Alexandra Macke, Fred Macke, III, Andrew Noyes, Tammy Noyes, Jason Oswald, Karen Oswald, Chris Pipes, Danielle Pipes, Howard Ramirez, Natalie Ramirez, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Jim Sandfoss, Kevin Schappell, Molly Schappell, Chris Speier, Laura Speier, Chad Stidham, Rebecca Stidham, Craig Twehues, Jessica Twehues, Brandon Voelker, Caitlin Voelker, Greg Works, Julianna Works. (Voelker, Brandon)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 EMERGENCY MOTION Dissolve TRO re #11 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Hearings, #12 Temporary Restraining Order, by Andy Beshear filed by Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Brian Boyers, Jessica Boyers, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Doug Clark, Jennifer Clark, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Hank Heitker, Susan Heitker, Rob Keller, Sherry Keller, Eric Lawrence, Maria Lawrence, Brian Lucas, Kimberly Lucas, Alexandra Macke, Fred Macke, III, Andrew Noyes, Tammy Noyes, Jason Oswald, Karen Oswald, Chris Pipes, Danielle Pipes, Howard Ramirez, Natalie Ramirez, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Jim Sandfoss, Kevin Schappell, Molly Schappell, Chris Speier, Laura Speier, Chad Stidham, Rebecca Stidham, Craig Twehues, Jessica Twehues, Brandon Voelker, Caitlin Voelker, Greg Works, Julianna Works. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Voelker, Brandon)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING by Andy Beshear re #11 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Hearings, #12 Temporary Restraining Order, #14 EMERGENCY MOTION Dissolve TRO re #11 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Hearings, #12 Temporary Restraining Order, by Andy Beshear of Supplemental Fact Development (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - KYSC Opinion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - EO 2021-632)(Mayo, Steven)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: That all pending motions and related matters will be taken up at the hearing on plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction on TUESDAY, AUGUST 24, 2021 AT 1:00 P.M. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/20/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EMERGENCY MOTION Dissolve TRO re #11 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Hearings, #12 Temporary Restraining Order, by Andy Beshear Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion to Dissolve, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2-3-21 Franklin Circuit Court Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - 3-3-21 Franklin Circuit Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - 4-7-21 Franklin Circuit Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Kentucky Court of Appeals Order, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mayo, Steven)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order by Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Brian Boyers, Jessica Boyers, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Doug Clark, Jennifer Clark, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Hank Heitker, Susan Heitker, Rob Keller, Sherry Keller, Eric Lawrence, Maria Lawrence, Brian Lucas, Kimberly Lucas, Alexandra Macke, Fred Macke, III, Andrew Noyes, Tammy Noyes, Jason Oswald, Karen Oswald, Chris Pipes, Danielle Pipes, Howard Ramirez, Natalie Ramirez, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Jim Sandfoss, Kevin Schappell, Molly Schappell, Chris Speier, Laura Speier, Chad Stidham, Rebecca Stidham, Craig Twehues, Jessica Twehues, Brandon Voelker, Caitlin Voelker, Greg Works, Julianna Works. (Voelker, Brandon)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Reopen Document #10 FIRST MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Brian Boyers, Jessica Boyers, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Doug Clark, Jennifer Clark, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Hank Heitker, Susan Heitker (ECO)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: (1) Defendant Governor Andy Beshear, his officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, or other persons who are in active concert or participation with him, be, and are hereby, ENJOINED from enforcing Executive Order 2021-585; and(2) Plaintiffs shall post a security bond in the amount of $10,000.00. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/19/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that: (1) Plaintiffs' Motion for an Ex-Parte Emergency Motion forInjunctive Relief (Doc. #1 -4 at 2-5) be, and is hereby, GRANTED. ATemporary Restraining Order shall enter concurrently herewith; and(2) A hearing on plaintiffs' motion for a preliminaryinjunction be, and is hereby, SET FOR AUGUST 24, 2021 AT 1:00 p.m.in Courtroom A. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/19/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Brian Boyers, Jessica Boyers, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Doug Clark, Jennifer Clark, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Hank Heitker, Susan Heitker, Rob Keller, Sherry Keller, Eric Lawrence, Maria Lawrence, Brian Lucas, Kimberly Lucas, Alexandra Macke, Fred Macke, III, Andrew Noyes, Tammy Noyes, Jason Oswald, Karen Oswald, Chris Pipes, Danielle Pipes, Howard Ramirez, Natalie Ramirez, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Jim Sandfoss, Kevin Schappell, Molly Schappell, Chris Speier, Laura Speier, Chad Stidham, Rebecca Stidham, Craig Twehues, Jessica Twehues, Brandon Voelker, Caitlin Voelker, Greg Works, Julianna Works (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Voelker, Brandon)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Danielle Pipes, Eric Lawrence, Craig Twehues, Kevin Schappell, Susan Heitker, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Brian Boyers, Jason Oswald, Natalie Ramirez, Greg Works, Rebecca Stidham, Howard Ramirez, Lindsey Archer, Andrew Futscher, Karen Carr, Chris Pipes, Dave Carr, Doug Clark, Fred Macke, III, Maria Lawrence, Rob Keller, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Noyes, Chris Speier, Alexandra Macke, Ashley Futscher, Julianna Works, Mike Dickhaus, Chad Stidham, Molly Schappell, Matt Archer, Kimberly Lucas, Karen Oswald, Tammy Noyes, Jim Sandfoss, Brian Lucas, Jennifer Clark, Jessica Boyers, Laura Speier, Brandon Voelker, Sherry Keller, Hank Heitker, Caitlin Voelker, Jessica Twehues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit School Closure Ex Order, #2 Exhibit Initial Mask Order, #3 Exhibit Senate Bill 1, #4 Exhibit House Joint Reopening Plan, #5 Exhibit Boone Circuit Order, #6 Exhibit Diocese Reopening Plan, #7 Exhibit Diocese Email re Governor's Order)(Voelker, Brandon)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Brandon Voelker re #8 Notice of Filing; Error: Exhibit was filed together with the notice instead of as separate attachment. Entry by attorney; Clerk added the exhibit as separate attachment. In the future, file each exhibit separately from one another and separate from the main document. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Lindsey Archer, Matt Archer, Brian Boyers, Jessica Boyers, Dave Carr, Karen Carr, Doug Clark, Jennifer Clark, Mike Dickhaus, Jessica Fischer, Andrew Futscher, Ashley Futscher, Hank Heitker, Susan Heitker, Rob Keller, Sherry Keller, Eric Lawrence, Maria Lawrence, Brian Lucas, Kimberly Lucas, Alexandra Macke, Fred Macke, III, Andrew Noyes, Tammy Noyes, Jason Oswald, Karen Oswald, Chris Pipes, Danielle Pipes, Howard Ramirez, Natalie Ramirez, Elizabeth Sandfoss, Jim Sandfoss, Kevin Schappell, Molly Schappell, Chris Speier, Laura Speier, Chad Stidham, Rebecca Stidham, Craig Twehues, Jessica Twehues, Brandon Voelker, Caitlin Voelker, Greg Works, Julianna Works Petition Verification (Voelker, Brandon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2021: #1 Petition Verification of Dr. Twehues) (ECO).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: plaintiffs shall file the verified or sworn statement of Dr. Tweheues or any other affiant in support of their Complaint and Ex-Parte Emergency motion for Injunctive Relief on or before Thursday, August 19, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/18/2021.(TJZ)cc: COR
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Andy Beshear re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing of Petition of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of Petition of State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 2 of Petition of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Exhibti 2 - Part of Petition of State Court Record)(Mayo, Steven)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This matter is REASSIGNED to the Hon. William O. Bertelsman. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/17/2021.(TJZ)cc: COR
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief (TJZ)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (SLG)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: re Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief (TJZ)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(SLG)cc: COR Modified text on 8/16/2021 (TJZ).
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00624. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5042499), filed by Andy Beshear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Record - Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Record - Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Emergency Motion, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing)(SLG) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (TJZ).
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief, filed as part of state court record #1 . (TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oswald et al v. Beshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Oswald
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Oswald
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sandfoss
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Sandfoss
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Fischer
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Dickhaus
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Boyers
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Boyers
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Jessica Twehues
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Twehues
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianna Works
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Works
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Stidham
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Stidham
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lawrence
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lawrence
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Keller
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Keller
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Lucas
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lucas
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Voelker
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Voelker
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Clark
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Clark
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Noyes
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Noyes
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Ramirez
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Ramirez
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Carr
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Carr
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Schappell
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Schappell
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Pipes
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Pipes
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Heitker
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Heitker
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Futscher
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Futscher
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Speier
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Speier
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Archer
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Archer
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Macke
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Macke, III
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Andy Beshear
Represented By: Laura Crittenden Tipton
Represented By: Marc Griffin Farris
Represented By: Steven Travis Mayo
Represented By: Taylor Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?