Beckerich et al v. Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christy Beckerich, Meghan Bentle, Christa Bowdler, Eileen Brinkman, Kim Brown, Andrea Burg, Stacey Caldwell, Jennifer Carlton, Carrisa Daugherty, Deanna Dudley, Andrea Halkiotis, April Hoskins, Maliza Jackson, Tiffany Justice, Heather King, Tiffany Manning, Rachel McNay, Elizabeth Mozea, Joy Patrick, Angela Perin, Kelly Reynolds, Valerie Rose, Seneca Sheldon, Monica Smith, Deela Sturm, Maja Vickers, Greta Westermeyer and Isabelle Wiehe
Defendant: Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. and Summit Medical Group, Inc. doing business as St. Elizabeth Physicians
Case Number: 2:2021cv00100
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/31/2021 before Judge David L. Bunning: 1) Clerk shall term this matter pursuant to Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice #13 ; 2) Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction #7 and Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert #12 are denied without prejudice. (Court Reporter Lisa Wiesman.) (TJZ)cc: COR
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VIRTUAL ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice #13 . Within that Notice they indicate that they "intend to refile." Having reviewed the Notice and the record herein, and being otherwise sufficiently advised, this matter is scheduled for an in-court STATUS CONFERENCE on Tuesday, 8/31/2021 at 01:00 PM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning to discuss the Notice. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 08/30/2021.(SLG)cc: COR
August 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christy Beckerich, Meghan Bentle, Christa Bowdler, Eileen Brinkman, Kim Brown, Andrea Burg, Stacey Caldwell, Jennifer Carlton, Carrisa Daugherty, Deanna Dudley, Andrea Halkiotis, April Hoskins, Maliza Jackson, Tiffany Justice, Heather King, Tiffany Manning, Rachel McNay, Elizabeth Mozea, Joy Patrick, Angela Perin, Kelly Reynolds, Valerie Rose, Seneca Sheldon, Monica Smith, Deela Sturm, Maja Vickers, Greta Westermeyer, Isabelle Wiehe (Romeo, Anthony)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Exclude by Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc. PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Entry Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Guilfoyle, Mark) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (TJZ).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VIRTUAL ORDER: Granting #9 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 08/27/2021. (SLG)cc: COR
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 filed by Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Gary Blank, #2 Exhibit 2 - CHFS Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - SEH Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 - 8/5 Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Exemption Request Forms, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Jacob Best, #7 Exhibit 7 - SEP Policy, #8 Exhibit 8 - SEP Exemption Request Forms, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Lori Ritchey-Baldwin, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Onyeka Nwankwo, M.D., #11 Exhibit 11 - Klaassen v. Trustees of Indiana Univ., #12 Exhibit 12 - Bridges v. Houston Methodist Hospital, #13 Exhibit 13 - DOJ DOL Opinion, #14 Exhibit 14 - EEOC Guidance)(Guilfoyle, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc. Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guilfoyle, Mark)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1) Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction on or before 8/27/2021 at 5:00 p.m. 2) ORAL ARGUMENT is set for 8/31/2021 at01:00 PM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/25/2021.(TJZ)cc: COR, Cov Diary
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction by Christy Beckerich, Meghan Bentle, Christa Bowdler, Eileen Brinkman, Kim Brown, Andrea Burg, Stacey Caldwell, Jennifer Carlton, Carrisa Daugherty, Deanna Dudley, Andrea Halkiotis, April Hoskins, Maliza Jackson, Tiffany Justice, Heather King, Tiffany Manning, Rachel McNay, Elizabeth Mozea, Joy Patrick, Angela Perin, Kelly Reynolds, Valerie Rose, Seneca Sheldon, Monica Smith, Deela Sturm, Maja Vickers, Greta Westermeyer, Isabelle Wiehe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romeo, Anthony) Modified text on 8/26/2021 (TJZ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Summit Medical Group, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Mark D. Guilfoyle. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by St. Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. and Summit Medical Group, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TJZ)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) This case is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2) The Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and to rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive or Daubert motions will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial and trial will be before the undersigned. 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties shall attempt to resolve the disputes between themselves; (2) if parties are unable to resolve disputes, they shall arrange telephone conference with Magistrate Judge; (3) if parties unable to resolve dispute, they may file appropriate motion. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011. (TJZ)cc: COR
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-1023. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5050046), filed by Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Summit Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint/Summons, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 NOR filed in State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(TJZ)
August 24, 2021 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckerich et al v. Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Beckerich
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Bentle
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Bowdler
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Brinkman
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Brown
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Burg
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Caldwell
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Carlton
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrisa Daugherty
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Dudley
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Halkiotis
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Hoskins
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maliza Jackson
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Justice
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather King
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Manning
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel McNay
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mozea
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Patrick
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Perin
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Reynolds
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Rose
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Sheldon
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Smith
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deela Sturm
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maja Vickers
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta Westermeyer
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabelle Wiehe
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Birkenhauer
Represented By: David V. Kramer
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Represented By: Olivia Christine Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Medical Group, Inc. doing business as St. Elizabeth Physicians
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Birkenhauer
Represented By: David V. Kramer
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Represented By: Olivia Christine Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?