Cottrill et al v. Mason County Animal Shelter et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Cottrill and Mary Cottrill
Defendant: Mason County Animal Shelter, Maysville Police Department, Manager Bill Howell, Assistant Manager Walter Teegarden and Unknown Mason County Animal Shelter Employee
Case Number: 2:2022cv00137
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bill Howell; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Dustin Cottrill re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wedl, Leah)
November 30, 2022 Clerk's Note: re #4 Notice of Filing Summons. Clerk advised counsel that Clerk can only serve one summons for named defendant. Counsel advised Clerk that she will file the correct summons. (ECO)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mason County Animal Shelter, Maysville Police Department, Walter Teegarden; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by Dustin Cottrill, Mary Cottrill re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Wedl, Leah)
November 8, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Leah Marie Wedl re #1 Complaint; attorney notifiedclerk the summons should be returned ELECTRONICALLY; however, aprepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint inthe fictitious miscellaneous case number 22-99999. A summons may beissued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance onpaper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with theprepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (ECO)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1)Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5406703), filed by Dustin Cottrill, Mary Cottrill.(ECO)
November 7, 2022 Conflict Check run. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottrill et al v. Mason County Animal Shelter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Cottrill
Represented By: Leah Marie Wedl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cottrill
Represented By: Leah Marie Wedl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County Animal Shelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maysville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manager Bill Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Manager Walter Teegarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mason County Animal Shelter Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?