Roberts v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Roberts
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Madonna Manor, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00129
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Roberts filed by Patricia Roberts. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Willliam B. Wahlheim, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (TJG)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Joinder #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims MOTION to Strike by Life Insurance Company of North America to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Purs filed by Madonna Manor, Inc.. (Jones, Alice)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Roberts filed by Madonna Manor, Inc.. (Jones, Alice)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF to #8 In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Thrash, Braxton)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Roberts filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order)(Thrash, Braxton)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to file an untimely response #15 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/23/2023. (TJG)cc: COR
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims MOTION to Strike by Life Insurance Company of North America to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to ERISA, #9 MOTION for Joinder #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims MOTION to Strike by Life Insurance Company of North America to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Purs filed by Patricia Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CHI Motion, #2 Exhibit B - Cruz v Std, #3 Exhibit C - IRS PL 201729010, #4 Exhibit D - DOL 95-07A, #5 Exhibit E - Madonna Articles, #6 Exhibit F - CHI Living Articles, #7 Exhibit G - Dignity Health Brief)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave by Patricia Roberts to file response to motions to dismiss out of time (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time #13 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/23/2023. (TJG)cc: COR
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims MOTION to Strike by Life Insurance Company of North America to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to ERISA, #9 MOTION for Joinder #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims MOTION to Strike by Life Insurance Company of North America to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Purs by Patricia Roberts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clark v Psybar, #2 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: the parties' proposed agreed order, filed as a motion #11 , is DENIED.Signed by Chief Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/20/2023. (SLG)cc: COR
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Motions to Dismiss by Patricia Roberts. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Roberts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CHI Motion, #2 Exhibit B - Cruz v Std, #3 Exhibit C - IRS PL 201729010, #4 Exhibit D - DOL 95-07A, #5 Exhibit E - Madonna Articles, #6 Exhibit F - CHI Living Articles, #7 Exhibit G - Dignity Health Brief, #8 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims MOTION to Strike by Life Insurance Company of North America to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to ERISA by Madonna Manor, Inc. (Jones, Alice)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims, MOTION to Strike by Life Insurance Company of North America to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to ERISA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Thrash, Braxton)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Grabhorn on behalf of Patricia Roberts (Grabhorn, Michael)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Grabhorn on behalf of Patricia Roberts (Grabhorn, Andrew)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Madonna Manor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Commonspirit Health, Corporate Parent CHI Living Communities for Madonna Manor, Inc... (Jones, Alice)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Thrash, Braxton)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Braxton S. Thrash, William B. Wahlheim, Jr., Alice A. Jones and Jennifer O. Mitchell has been filed by Life Insurance Company of North America and Madonna Mannor, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLG)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-01144. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5657415), filed by Life Insurance Company of North America, Madonna Manor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Coverage Limitations and Exclusions under Ohio Life and Health Insurance Act, #3 Exhibit C-Cigna Erisa Coverage Worksheet, #4 Exhibit D-2021 Form 5500, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2023: #6 Exhibit E-Declaration of Katy Cecil) (SLG).
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (SLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Roberts
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madonna Manor, Inc.
Represented By: Alice A. Jones
Represented By: Jennifer Orr Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?