Strader v. Kentucky Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources et al
Plaintiff: |
James N. Strader |
Defendant: |
Kentucky Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources, Jonathan W. Gassett and John Does 1-10 |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00062 |
Filed: |
December 14, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Frankfort Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Danny C. Reeves |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 6, 2012 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) The Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants Jonathan W. Gassett and John Does 1-10 (Record No. 34 ) is GRANTED with respect to Gassett in his individual and official capacities and DENIED as moot wi th respect to the John Doe defendants. (2) The claims asserted against the John Doe defendants are DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). (3) The defendants' motion in limine (Record No. 35 ) is DENIED as moot. (4) All claims having been resolved, this matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. A final and appealable judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/6/2012.(AKR)cc: COR
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) The Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Jonathan W. Gassett in his individual capacity 5 is GRANTED with respect to Counts Two, Three, Four, Five, and Seven; the allegations contained in paragraphs 88-90 of Count One; an d all claims under the Kentucky Constitution. The motion is DENIED with respect to the remainder of Count One and Count Six. (2) The Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources and Jonathan W. Gassett and John Does 1-10 in their official capacities 6 is GRANTED as to the Kentucky Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources. As to the remaining defendants, the motion is GRANTED with respect to Counts Two, Three, Four, Five, Six, and Seven; the allegations set forth i n paragraphs 88-90 of Count One; and all claims under the Kentucky Constitution. The motion is DENIED with respect to the remainder of Count One, to the extent Strader seeks prospective injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/19/2011.(CBD)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?