Turner v. Kentucky Transportation Cabinet et al
Plaintiff: Ellsworth H. Turner
Defendant: Kentucky Transportation Cabinet and Steve Damron
Case Number: 3:2010cv00039
Filed: June 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Frankfort Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendant Kentucky Transportation Cabinet's Motion for Summary Judgment 64 is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff Ellsworth Turner's Motions to Set Aside Pre-Trial Conference 67 and Motion for an Extension of Time t o File Response/Reply to Pretrial Memoranda 73 are DENIED, as moot. The pre-trial conference currently scheduled for August 14, 2013, and the bench trial scheduled for September 3, 2013, are CANCELED. 3. A separate Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/13/2013.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex Diary
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The defendant's Motion to Hold Proceedings in Abeyance 35 is GRANTED. This matter will be held in abeyance, pending further orders. 2. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report no later than January 30, 2012, advising the Court of the status of any and all state court proceedings related in any way to the claims and/or defenses asserted herein. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/29/2011.(CBD)cc: COR
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff Ellsworth Turner'sSecond Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process 18 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/4/2011.(CBD)cc: COR
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Defendant Steve Damrons motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [Record No. 8] is DENIED. The plaintiff is given a period of twenty (20) days from the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to complete service of the summons and complaint over Defendant Steve Damron. To the extent that language in the defendants response to the plaintiffs motion to dismiss could be construed as a motion to compel Defendant Kentucky Transportation Cabinet to provide information regarding Defendant Damron, such relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/3/2010. (Motions terminated: 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Steve Damron).(AKR)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Kentucky Transportation Cabinet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellsworth H. Turner
Represented By: Aubrey Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Transportation Cabinet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Damron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?