Hinkle et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Jason Turner and Natya Stafford
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00024
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Frankfort Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OPINION re objections to proposed jury instructions. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/23/2013.(AKR)cc: COR
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. James Baker and Dr. James Bilbo (Record No. 99 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Dr. James Baker and Dr. James Bilbo's testimony will be limited to issues concerning their treatment of Jason Turner and Natya Stafford. Dr. Baker and Dr. Bilbo will be allowed to testify regarding issues of causation and prior medical records, to the extent that testimony pertains to their treatment of Turner and Stafford. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/13/2013.(AKR)cc: COR
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER:1. Defendant Ford Motor Company's Renewed Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Filed Designation of Deposition Excerpts 85 is DENIED. 2. Defendant Ford Motor Company will be granted leave to file objections to the depositions excerpts designated by in the Plaintiffs' Compliance with the Court's Orders of November 5, 2012 and November 7, 2012. 84 Further Ford will be allowed to counter-designate excerpts from the depositions of Gurminder S. Bedi and Douglas W. Scott taken in connection with the case of Conley v. Ford, State Court of Cobb County, State of Georgia, Case No. 2007A15560-4, for the purpose of providing appropriate contextual and rebuttal evidence. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/21/2012.(CBD)cc: COR
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Renewed Motion in Limine to exclude the testimony of Plaintiff Natya Stafford and Richard Stafford regarding Ford's advertising and marketing, and testimony that Staf ford purchased the subject vehicle as a result of Ford's overall marketing of the Mercury Mountaineer as a safe vehicle (Record No. 73 ) is GRANTED. (2) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Renewed Motion in Limine to exclude excerpts from Ford's marketing materials, specifically the AdvanceTrac and Ford Safety Articles (Record No. 73 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/20/2012.(AKR)cc: COR
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that plaintiffs' Mtn in Limine to Exclude Opinioin Testimony by State Troopers and to Exclude the Kentucky Uniform Police Traffic Collision Report and Related Documents (Record No. 34 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/19/2012.(AKR)cc: COR
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Dft Ford Motor Company's Motion In Limine (Record No. 38 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/13/2012.(AKR)cc: COR
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Record No. 39 ) is GRANTED with respect to punitive damages. The motion is also GRANTED insofar as Ford seeks to prevent separ ate recovery of hedonic damages by Turner and Stafford and the claim of Kiara Hinkle's estate for loss of family services. Ford's motion is DENIED regarding the issue of whether the Estate of Kiara Hinkle may recover hedonic damages. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/7/2012.(AKR)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinkle et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Turner
Represented By: Donald H. Slavik
Represented By: Todd VanDerVeer McMurtry
Represented By: Kevin F. Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natya Stafford
Represented By: Kevin F. Hoskins
Represented By: Todd VanDerVeer McMurtry
Represented By: Donald H. Slavik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Lindsay E. DeMoss
Represented By: R. Thaddeus Keal
Represented By: Paul F. Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?