Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Conway

Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00051
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Frankfort Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment (Record No. 64 ) is DENIED. 2. Defendant Jack Conway's Motion for Summary Judgment (Record No. 65 ) is GRANTED. 3. Defendant Jack Co nway's Motion in Limine (Record No. 66 ) is DENIED as moot. 4. Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation's Motion to Withdraw Jury Demand (Record No. 89 ) is DENIED as moot. 5. A separate Judgment will be entered this date in favor of Defendant Jack Conway. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/24/2013.(AKR)cc: COR
March 21, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Plaintiff Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation's Motion for Preliminary Injunctions (Record No. 2 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/21/2012.(AKR)cc: COR
March 26, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Jack Conway's Motion to Dismiss 17 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/23/2012.(CBD)cc: COR
December 19, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Dft Commonwealth of KY ex rel, Atty General Jack Conway's Renewed Motion to Dismiss (Record No. 36 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/19/2012.(AKR)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: John H. Beisner
Represented By: Jessica Davidson Miller
Represented By: Winston E. Miller
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.