Medley v. Shelby County, Kentucky et al

Plaintiff: Robert Medley
Defendant: Shelby County, Kentucky, Rob Rothenberger, Bobby Waits, Ann Doyle, Unknown Guards, Anderson County, Kentucky, Anthony Howell, Jr., Joani Clark, Shelby County Detention Center, John Wayne Conway, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Unknown Doctor(s) and Unknown Nurse(s)
Case Number: 3:2013cv00035
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Frankfort Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Gregory F. Van Tatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [R. 55] is GRANTED, with a Judgment to be entered contemporaneously herewith. This Order does not affect Medley's claims against the remaining Defendant(s) who did not join in the immediate motion. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/2/2016.(AKR)cc: COR
January 28, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [R. 56] is GRANTED, with a Judgment to be entered contemporaneously herewith. This Order does not affect Medley's claims against the remaining Defendants who did not join in the immediate motion. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/28/2016.(AKR)cc: COR
April 30, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Mtn for Judgment on Pleadings by Dfts Ronald Waldridge, MD, Dana Aldridge, and Christina Peach (R. 35 ) is GRANTED; and 2. All of Plff Robert Medley's claims as agnst Dfts Ronald Waldridge, MD, Dana Aldridge, and Christina Peach are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 3. Dfts Ronald Waldridge, MD, Dana Aldridge, and Chritina Peach are DISMISSED as party dfts. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/30/2015.(AKR)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medley v. Shelby County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Medley
Represented By: Douglas C. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Rothenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Guards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Howell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joani Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wayne Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Represented By: Margaret Allison Batton Moreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Doctor(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurse(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?