Kentucky Retirement Systems v. BHEP GP I, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Kentucky Retirement Systems |
Defendant: |
BHEP GP I, LLC, BHEP GP II, LLC, BHEP GP II-B, LLC, BHEP GP III, LLC, Bay Hills Capital Management, LLC and Lance Mansbridge |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv00027 |
Filed: |
May 15, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Frankfort Office |
County: |
Franklin |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory F. VanTatenhove |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 15, 2020 |
Filing
45
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Bay Hills' objections are overruled and Pla is awarded $86,825.50. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/15/2020.(SCD)cc: COR
|
January 22, 2020 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) 35 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. (2) Pla shall submit evidence detailing the fees and costs w/in 30 days of entry of this Order. (3) If Dfts have objections file those w/in 15 days of Pla's filing. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/22/2020. (SCD)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Kentucky Retirement Systems v. BHEP GP I, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Kentucky Retirement Systems |
Represented By: |
Joseph Patrick Bowman |
Represented By: |
Mark A. Cameli |
Represented By: |
Katherine Irene Rupinen |
Represented By: |
Christopher E. Schaefer |
Represented By: |
Brent A. Simerson |
Represented By: |
Ryan S. Stippich |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: BHEP GP I, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert Coleman Stilz, III |
Represented By: |
Lynn Sowards Zellen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: BHEP GP II, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert Coleman Stilz, III |
Represented By: |
Lynn Sowards Zellen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: BHEP GP II-B, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert Coleman Stilz, III |
Represented By: |
Lynn Sowards Zellen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: BHEP GP III, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert Coleman Stilz, III |
Represented By: |
Lynn Sowards Zellen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bay Hills Capital Management, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert Coleman Stilz, III |
Represented By: |
Lynn Sowards Zellen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Lance Mansbridge |
Represented By: |
Robert Coleman Stilz, III |
Represented By: |
Lynn Sowards Zellen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?