Lacy v. Oxmoor Auto, Inc.
Plaintiff: Troy Lacy
Defendant: Oxmoor Auto, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00039
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Frankfort Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. Defendant Oxmoor Auto, Inc.s Motion to Stay #4 is GRANTED; 2. The parties Proposed Agreed Order #9 is GRANTED; 3. This matter is stayed pending arbitration; and 4. The parties shall file a joint status report every sixty (60) days while this matter is being arbitrated to update the Court as to the progress of the case; and 5. Within fourteen (14) days of a decision in arbitration, the parties shall notify the Court as to how they believe this action should proceed. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/10/2018.(CBD)cc: COR
August 28, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration by Oxmoor Auto, Inc. (CBD)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration by Oxmoor Auto, Inc.. (Doll, Cynthia)
August 20, 2018 Clerk's Note re #8 Notice to Attorney: Counsel contacted clerk to advise name signed on the State Court Complaint was changed from Christina J. Thomas to Christina Thomas Mazaheri. Counsel's name was corrected in the record and the Notice #8 may be disregarded. (CBD)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Christina Thomas by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Form, #2 LR 83.1 re Admission, #3 LR 83.2 re PHV Admission, #4 Data Form)(CBD)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. The Joint Agreed Extension #5 is GRANTED; and 2. Plaintiff Troy Lacy shall have up to and including Thursday, August 30, 2018, by which to respond to Defendants Motion #4 to Stay and/or Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/20/2018.(CBD)cc: COR
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Troy Lacy. (Mazaheri, Christina)
August 16, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation that Plaintiff may have an enlargement of fourteen (14) days to respond to Defendants motion to stay and/or dismiss #4 by Troy Lacy (CBD)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation that Plaintiff may have an enlargement of fourteen (14) days to respond to Defendants motion to stay and/or dismiss #4 by Troy Lacy. (Mazaheri, Bernard) Modified text on 8/16/2018 (CBD).
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay by Oxmoor Auto, Inc. and/or Dismiss Judicial Proceeding and Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Application for Employment, #3 Exhibit B - Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate, #4 Exhibit C - Employee Handbook/Receipt Acknowledgment, #5 Proposed Order)(U'Sellis, Megan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oxmoor Auto, Inc.. (CBD)
July 19, 2018 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00662 ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4124096), filed by Oxmoor Auto, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacy v. Oxmoor Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Lacy
Represented By: Christina J. Thomas
Represented By: Bernard R. Mazaheri
Represented By: Christina Thomas Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxmoor Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Blevins Doll
Represented By: Megan R. U'Sellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?