Cochran v. SSA
Plaintiff: Sarah Ann Cochran
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00039
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Ann Cochran via USMS to Commissioner of SSA served on 6/10/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via USMS on 6/10/2019; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via USMS on 6/12/2019. (SCD)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is ordered that #3 Motion for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/3/2019. (SCD)cc: COR
May 31, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #3 MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Ann Cochran. (SCD)
May 31, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Melissa Palmer re #3 MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Ann Cochran. (SCD)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Attorney EDKY, #2 Summons - US Attorney General)(CBD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #3 USM receipt) (SCD).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. motion #2 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. The plaintiff may proceed herein without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/30/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, USM
May 30, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Ann Cochran ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4372867) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
May 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sarah Ann Cochran (CBD)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (AO 240) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sarah Ann Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CBD)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Sarah Ann Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Summons - US Attorney EDKY, #4 Summons - Commissioner SSA, #5 Summons - US Attorney General, #6 USM 285 - US Atorney EDKY, #7 USM 285 - Commissioner SSA, #8 USM 285 - US Attorney General)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Ann Cochran
Represented By: Melissa Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?