Chadwell v. Proctor et al
Plaintiff: Damon Chadwell
Defendant: John Proctor, Southern Health Partners, Jerimah, Matt, Suesan, Matt Lowe, Jeremy Wells and Susanne
Case Number: 3:2019cv00043
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Matt Lowe, John Proctor, Susanne, Jeremy Wells,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Lowe, #2 Summons - Wells, #3 Summons - Susanne)(CBD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #4 Receipt) (SCD).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Chadwells claims against Southern Health Care Partners are DISMISSED; 2. Chadwells allegations related to an April 18, 2019 Eighth Amendment violation are DISMISSED; 3. Chadwells allegations related to a March 26, 2019 Eighth Amendment violation may PROCEED consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order; 4. Clerk shall prepare four "Service Packets" for service upon John Proctor, Susanne, Matt Lowe, and Jeremy Walls. The Service Packets shall include: a. a completed summons form; b. the amended complaint #10 ; c. the order granting Chadwell pauper status #12 ; d. a copy of this order; and e. a completed USM Form 285; 5. Clerk shall send the Service Packets to the USMS in Lexington, Ky, and shall note the date of delivery in the docket; 6. The USMS shall personally serve the defendants through cooperation with the Carroll County Detention Center, 800 Clay Street, Carrollton, Kentucky, 41008; 7. Chadwell must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change to his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case; and 8. If Chadwell wishes to seek relief from the Court, he must do so by filing a formal motion sent to the Clerks Office. Every motion Chadwell files must include a written certification that he has mailed a copy of it to the defendants or their counsel and must state the date of mailing. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/12/2019.(CBD)cc: COR, USM, Chadwell vis US Mail
August 2, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #15 Mail Returned (SCD)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Damon Chadwell re #12 Order. (SCD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. (CBD)cc: COR
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address to 1214 Courtland Avenue, Apt. H, Carrollton, KY 41008 by Damon Chadwell, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBD)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1. Motion #11 is GRANTED. 2. initial partial filing fee is DEFERRED; 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account for receipt of Chadwells future payments. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525). The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form upon the warden of the institution in which Chadwell is currently confined; 4. Chadwell's custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of Chadwells income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 5. The Court DENIES motion #9 requesting that the Court order the Carroll County Detention Center to provide a certified copy of his inmate account statement. 6. Chadwell must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change to his current mailing address. 7. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 EDKY 525) (CBD)cc: COR, Chadwell and Carroll Cty Jail w/ EDKY 525 by USPS
July 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #10 Complaint (CBD)
July 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #11 MOTION to Proceed IFP (CBD)
July 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #9 MOTION for Order by Damon Chadwell (CBD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Proceed IFP by Damon Chadwell, pro se. (Attachments: #1 523 - Certificate, #2 Envelope)(CBD) Modified on 7/1/2019 (CBD).
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Damon Chadwell, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order directing Jailer to produce six moths statement of funds by Damon Chadwell, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (CBD) Envelope at #10 . Modified on 7/1/2019 (CBD).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1) #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2) Chadwell may re-file his fee motion and civil rights complaint by carefully following the instructions in the Court's #6 Order. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/25/2019. (SCD)cc: Pro Se Pla via US Mail
June 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #7 Notice of filing page 16 to Complaint and Summonses re #1 Complaint. (CBD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF Page 16 of complaint #1 and Summons re #1 Complaint by Damon Chadwell, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope)(CBD)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Clerk is DIRECTED to send Chadwell a EDKy Form 520 which must complete and return. 2) Clerk is DIRECTED to send Chadwell a Form AO-240 and EDKy Form 523. 3) Either pay the $350 filing and $50 admin fee or complete and file both forms. 4) Take these steps w/in 30 days or case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/18/2019.(SCD)cc: Pro Se Pla via US Mail w forms
June 14, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damon Chadwell (CBD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(CBD)
June 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Damon Chadwell, pro se. (CBD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damon Chadwell, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Damon Chadwell, pro se. Referred to PSO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Summons)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chadwell v. Proctor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerimah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Chadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?