CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00056
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Proposed Order Alternative Proposed Order)(Duncan, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: joint motion #7 is GRANTED. Defendant Southern Coal shall have up to October 11, 2019 to file its answer to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/13/2019. (CBD)cc: COR
September 13, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for a 30-day extension by Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc. (CBD)
September 13, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Robert Franklin Duncan,Patrick F. Estill for Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc. added. (CBD)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for a 30-day extension by Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc.. (Duncan, Robert) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (CBD).
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CSX Transportation, Inc. via Certified Mail, Return Receipt to Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Johnson, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Johnson, William)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO William E. Johnson re #1 Complaint ; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (MM)
August 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William E. Johnson. #1 Complaint has been filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4438288), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc.)(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: William E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Coal and Land Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Represented By: Patrick F. Estill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?