Truesdell et al v. Meier et al
Plaintiff: Legacy Medical Transport, LLC and Phillip Truesdell
Defendant: Adam Meier, Steven Davis, Kristi Putnam and Timothy Feeley
Case Number: 3:2019cv00066
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Steven Davis, Timothy Feeley, Adam Meier, Kristi Putnam (CBD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Davis, Adam Meier, Kristi Putnam, filed by Phillip Truesdell, Legacy Medical Transport, LLC.(Boden, Anastasia)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Steven Davis, Timothy Feeley, Adam Meier, Kristi Putnam , MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Steven Davis, Timothy Feeley, Adam Meier, Kristi Putnam (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Meredith, S.)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint upon the Kentucky Attorney General on 9/25/2019 by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell (Boden, Anastasia) Modified text on 10/30/2019 (CBD).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: joint motion #13 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including Tuesday, October 29, 2019, to file its answer to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/15/2019. (CBD)cc: COR
October 11, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for extension of time to file Answer or other responsive pleading (SCD)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for extension of time to file Answer or other responsive pleading by Steven Davis, Timothy Feeley, Adam Meier, Kristi Putnam, Phillip Truesdell, Legacy Medical Transport, LLC. (Kleinert, Matthew) Modified on 10/11/2019 (SCD).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1. Motion #4 is GRANTED; and 2. Mollie Williams is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/7/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, Williams w/ ECF Reg. Form by US Mail
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1. Motion #3 is GRANTED; 2. Anastasia P. Boden is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/7/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, Boden w/ ECF Reg. Form by US Mail
September 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Boden, #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Williams (SCD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing Williams)(Thacker, Christopher)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Boden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing Boden)(Thacker, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE Filing fee received - for Anastasia P. Boden and Mollie Williams - $ 250.00, receipt number 5028424 re #3 and #4 Motions. (CBD) Modified on 9/26/2019 (SCD).
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Legacy Medical Transport LLC for Legacy Medical Transport, LLC.. (Thacker, Christopher)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Christopher L. Thacker re #3 MOTION for Leave by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell for Boden Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 MOTION for Leave by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell Williams Admission Pro Hac Vice: attorney failed tosubmit the appropriate $125 filing fee per motion; within 7 calendar days, attorney shall submit the $125 filing fee to the Clerk. cc: COR (SCD)
September 24, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Anastasia P. Boden, Mollie Williams re #4 MOTION for Leave Williams Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 MOTION for Leave for Boden Admission Pro Hac Vice by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell. (SCD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Christopher L. Thacker. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steven Davis, Timothy Feeley, Adam Meier, Kristi Putnam; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SCD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Williams by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mollie Williams, #2 Proposed Order)(Thacker, Christopher) Modified on 9/26/2019 (SCD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (SCD).
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Boden by Legacy Medical Transport, LLC, Phillip Truesdell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Boden, #2 Proposed Order Boden)(Thacker, Christopher) Modified on 9/26/2019 (SCD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (SCD).
September 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SCD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, filed by Phillip Truesdell, Legacy Medical Transport, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4472011) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued for Steven Davis, #3 Summons to be issued for Timothy Feeley, #4 Summons to be issued for Kristi Putnam, #5 Summons to be issued for Adam Meier)(SCD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truesdell et al v. Meier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Meier
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: Matthew Harold Kleinert
Represented By: Johann Frederick Herklotz
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Davis
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: Matthew Harold Kleinert
Represented By: Johann Frederick Herklotz
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Putnam
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: Matthew Harold Kleinert
Represented By: Johann Frederick Herklotz
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Feeley
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: Matthew Harold Kleinert
Represented By: Johann Frederick Herklotz
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legacy Medical Transport, LLC
Represented By: Mollie Williams
Represented By: Anastasia P. Boden
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: Anastasia Paulinna Boden
Represented By: Mollie Rebekah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Truesdell
Represented By: Mollie Williams
Represented By: Anastasia P. Boden
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: Anastasia Paulinna Boden
Represented By: Mollie Rebekah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?