Nixon v. Anthem, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Nixon and Robyn Zinsmeister
Defendant: Anthem UM Services, Inc, and Anthem, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00076
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: joint motion #10 is GRANTED. Motion #7 to dismiss and strike jury demand is DENIED as moot. Defendants shall have up to and including 1/17/2020, to file its Answer or respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/2/2019.(CBD)cc: COR
November 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #10 Proposed Agreed Order (SCD)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order by Robert Nixon, Robyn Zinsmeister, Anthem, Inc., Anthem UM Services, Inc.. (Fairbanks, Philip) Modified on 11/26/2019 (SCD).
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Anthem UM Services, Inc,, Anthem, Inc., filed by Robert Nixon, Robyn Zinsmeister.(Fairbanks, Philip)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Anthem UM Services, Inc,, Anthem, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Anthem UM Services, Inc,, Anthem, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Renzelmann, Jason)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Anthem UM Services, Inc,, Anthem, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit EX A - SPD - Summary Plan Description, #3 Exhibit EX B - Declaration of Mary Ellen Cassidy, #4 Exhibit EX C - Sept. 10, 2019 Letter)(Renzelmann, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #5 Proposed Order) (SCD).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: the joint motion #5 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including November 4, 2019, to file its Answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/28/2019. (CBD)cc: COR
October 28, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint by Anthem UM Services, Inc,, Anthem, Inc. (CBD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Anthem UM Services, Inc,, Anthem, Inc.. (Renzelmann, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anthem UM Services, Inc, identifying Other Affiliate ANTM for Anthem UM Services, Inc (CBD)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anthem, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate ANTM for Anthem, Inc. (CBD)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-977. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4501971), filed by Anthem UM Services, Inc, Anthem, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Anthem, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem UM Services, Inc,
Represented By: Gene F. Price
Represented By: Jason P. Renzelmann
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Represented By: Gene F. Price
Represented By: Jason P. Renzelmann
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nixon
Represented By: Erik David Peterson
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Zinsmeister
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?