Suter et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Troy W. Suter and Carol Ann Suter
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC, Gynecare Worldwide and Ethicon, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00079
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review and scheduling: #1 Complaint, #12 Master Complaint, #92 -2 Master Answer and #92 -3 Master Answer. (CBD)
November 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 97 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:12-cv-01712. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered attorneys
November 7, 2019 Filing 96 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2062) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #2 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #3 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #4 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #5 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 4 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #6 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 5 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #7 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 6 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #8 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 7 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #9 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2182) Part 8 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #10 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2217) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Anne Weber, #11 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2390) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Anne Weber, #12 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2533) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Anne Weber, #13 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2594) Notice of Adoption of Reply in Support of Motion to Anne Weber)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 95 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2407) Notice of Adoption of Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2509) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2583) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Regarding Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 4 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 5 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 6 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 7 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 8 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 9 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 10 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 11 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 12 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 13 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2047) Part 14 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2049) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2163) Part 1 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2163) Part 2 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2163) Part 3 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2241) Reply to Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2439) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2528) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2622) Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of Motion of Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 94 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 4 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 5 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 6 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 7 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 8 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 9 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 10 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 11 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 12 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 13 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 14 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 15 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 16 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 17 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 18 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 19 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (1978) Part 20 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2188) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Limit Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2188) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Limit Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2188) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Limit Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2188) Part 4 Response in Opposition to Motion to Limit Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 93 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2011) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Roger McLendon, #2 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2142) Resposne to Motion to Exclude Roger McLendon, #3 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2252) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Roger McLendon, #4 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2426) Notice of Adoptoin of Prior Daubert Motion of Robert McLendon, #5 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2502) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Roger McLendon, #6 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2608) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Roger McLendon, #7 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2455) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2455) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2458) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2553) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2553) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2553) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2621) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2060) Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #15 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2065) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #16 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2134) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #17 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2232) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #18 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2462) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Timothy Ulatowski, #19 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2497) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #20 Exhibit ECF# 92 Continued - (2615) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 92 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (239) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (241) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit (262) Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit (2063) Part 1 Motion to Preclude Testimony of Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit (2063) Part 2 Motion to Preclude Testimony of Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit (2069) Memo in Support of Motion to Preclude Juan Carlos Felix, #9 Exhibit (2184) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #10 Exhibit (2184) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #11 Exhibit (2255) Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Preclude Juan Carlos Felix, #12 Exhibit (2399) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Juan Carlos Felix, #13 Exhibit (2507) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Juan Carlos Felix, #14 Exhibit (2599) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Juan Carlos Felix, #15 Exhibit (2044) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #16 Exhibit (2044) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #17 Exhibit (2045) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #18 Exhibit (2183) Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #19 Exhibit (2235) Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Nicolette Horbach, #20 Exhibit (2405) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Nicolette Horbach, #21 Exhibit (2491) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Nicolette Horbach, #22 Exhibit (2602) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Nicolette Horbach)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 11/13/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 11/12/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/30/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 JOINT MOTION by Troy W. Suter, Carol Ann Suter, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief from Dismissal Order re: #88 Order; the Clerk is directed to reinstate this action into the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/29/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 89 JOINT MOTION by Troy W. Suter, Carol Ann Suter, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Relief from Dismissal Order re: #88 Order. (Gage, William) (Modified on 7/23/2019 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Joint Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; the Clerk is directed to remove this action from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 87 JOINT MOTION by Troy W. Suter, Carol ann Suter, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2019 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PRETRIAL ORDER # 338 (Adoption of PTO # 329 (Dismissal of Settled and Paid Cases)) To effectively and efficiently streamline procedures and be as consistent as possible throughout MDL 2327 the court ORDERS that PTO No. 329 is ADOPTED for every case in MDL 2327 assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 5/3/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 22, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #85 Order. ERROR: Incorrect document attached. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER directing as follows: 1) The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is now extended to 10/31/2018, for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket; 2) For all cases on an inactive docket and all cases to be put on an inactive docket, the parties may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by 10/31/2018, then the court may have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket, or dismiss the cases without prejudice; and 3) All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/21/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member cases assigned to Chief Judge Johnston that is on an inactive docket) (pma) (Modified on 8/21/2018 to remove and replace incorrect image)(ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER The #81 Order (Change to Characterization by Clerk's Office of Cases on Inactive Docket) is VACATED as to this civil action. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/17/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 5/17/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston, Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 82 ASSIGNMENT ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation: The Honorable Thomas E. Johnston is assigned as the transferee judge for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 over any actions transferred by the Panel that present recusal issues for the original transferee judge. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair for the Panel, on 5/7/2018. (cc: attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Attachment) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #84 ORDER ENTERED 5/17/2018: ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (brn) (Modified on 5/17/2018 to note order has been vacated) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER Having been advised by counsel that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson have agreed to a settlement model. The Court finds it unnecessary to conduct further proceedings or to keep this case on the active docket and ORDERS as follows: 1) all discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the Court, 2) the Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket, 3) Plaintiffs and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 12/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress. The Court will reinstate any case to the active docket if one of the parties, on motion, shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is linked to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. #79 . Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/19/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 79 PROPOSED ORDER Inactive Docket Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PRETRIAL ORDER # 271 (ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS EXTENDING DISCOVERY) After a cursory review of many individual cases in the Ethicon MDL, the court notes that the parties have attempted to stipulate a change in the court's Docket Control Orders setting deadlines for discovery. The parties cannot extend court ordered discovery deadlines past the date set for completion of discovery without approval from the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 29(b); see Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16(b)(4). Here, the parties are repeatedly attempting to stipulate to delay the completion of discovery, which affects other deadlines in the Docket Control Orders, such as the deadline for filing dispositive motions and the deadline for filing Daubert motions. Under Local Rule 16.1(f)(3), the court is not required to, nor does it, recognize stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines past the close of discovery. See LR Civ. P. 16.1(f)(3). All such stipulations filed in the Ethicon MDL which are inconsistent with Local Rule 16.1(f)(3) are INEFFECTUAL and VOID and undermine the policy goals of the MDL, including convenience of the parties, efficiency of the pretrial proceedings, and consistency on related issues. The parties are DIRECTED to cease filing such stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines contrary to Local Rule 16.1(f)(3). When the parties seek an extension of discovery deadlines past the date set for the completion of discovery in the Docket Control Order, they must do so by motion in the individual case. The Docket Control Orders are plain that the only discovery permitted after the close of discovery are depositions of the plaintiffs friends and family members, and only if such depositions are requested before the discovery deadline. Those orders remain unaffected. Modifications of the discovery schedule, for good cause shown will be considered. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see, e.g., PTO #251 at A.2.f. Good cause does not include mere agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/27/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327 and Wave 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 Cases Assigned to Judge Chambers) (rec) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 77 ASSIGNMENT ORDER the Southern District of West Virginia has notified the Panel of the need to assign another judge from within that district to preside over certain cases in which the original transferee judge, the Honorable Joseph R. Goodwin, is recused. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, the Honorable Robert C. Chambers is assigned as the transferee judge for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 over any actions transferred by the Panel that present recusal issues for the original transferee judge. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER (RE: FEE COMMITTEE PROTOCOL) Pursuant to Section C of the "Order Establishing Criteria for Applications to MDL Fund To Compensate and Reimburse Attorneys for Services Performed and Expenses Incurred for MDL Administration and Common Benefit and Appointment of Common Benefit Fee and Cost Committee" (PTO # 211), the Common Benefit Fee and Cost Committee outlines the process for review of common benefit time submitted and the process for application for fees and expenses as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 6/28/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits 1-4) (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 75 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 74 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D.) The Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D. is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 2 casesidentified in Exhibit A) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Larry T. Sirls, M.D.) The Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Exclude the General Opinion Testimony of Larry T. Sirls, II, M.D. is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 2 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER reassigning the civil actions listed on Exhibit A from the docket of Judge Joseph R. Goodwin to the docket of the Chief Judge Robert C. Chambers for all further proceedings pursuant to 28 United States Code, 455(b)(5)(iii). The Clerk is directed to file this order in the individual cases listed on Exhibit A and to file a copy of this order on the docket for the main MDL 2327. Signed by Clerk of Court Teresa L. Deppner on 11/22/2016. (cc: Judge Goodwin, Chief Judge Chambers, counsel of record, and to any unrepresented parties) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases listed on Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PRETRIAL ORDER # 241 (Re: Order Dismissing Ethicon, LLC in Cases Listed on Exhibit A) dismissing without prejudice Ethicon, LLC from each case identified on Exhibit A, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/12/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
September 7, 2016 Filing 69 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #68 Response In Opposition. (Pope, Susan) Modified to remove links to #64 motion and #65 memorandum on 9/8/2016 (gjb). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 31, 2016 Filing 68 RESPONSE by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter in opposition to #64 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Strike Errata of Dr. Lennox Hoyte and Affidavit of Carol Suter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - errata Hoyte MD, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Affidavit Carol Suter, #3 Exhibit(s) C - excerpts depo Carol Suter, #4 Exhibit(s) D - S&W fee agreement, #5 Exhibit(s) E - email to Golkow attaching errata, #6 Exhibit(s) F - excerpts depo Hoyte MD, #7 Exhibit(s) G - Hoyte MD's Rule 26 report)(Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 67 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #63 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Felix Report, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 -Willey dep. excerpts, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Hoyte dep. excerpts)(Pope, Susan) Modified to remove links to #54 motion and #55 memorandum on 8/20/2016 (gjb). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 66 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #62 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Hoyte Errata)(Pope, Susan) Modified to remove links to #56 motion and #57 memorandum on 8/20/2016 (gjb). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #64 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike (Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Strike Errata of Dr. Lennox Hoyte and Affidavit of Carol Suter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Suter. C. dep. excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Hoyte dep. excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Suter Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Hoyte Errata, #5 Exhibit E - PFS pages)(Pope, Susan) (Modified on 8/19/2016 to add party filer)(skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter in opposition to #54 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinion Testimony of Edward N. Willey, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Rule 26 Report Willey MD, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Excerpts Depo Willey MD, #3 Exhibit(s) C - PLs Rule 26 Disclosures, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Excerpts Depo Azadi MD)(Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter in opposition to #56 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinion Testimony of Lennox Hoyte, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Rule 26 Report Hoyte MD, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Excerpts Depo Hoyte MD, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Excerpts Depo Mann MD, #4 Exhibit(s) D - PLs Rule 26 Disclosures)(Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 4, 2016 Filing 61 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #58 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hoyte Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mann Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Azadi Deposition Excerpts)(Pope, Susan) (Modified on 8/15/2016 to remove links to #51 motion and #52 memorandum) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 1, 2016 Filing 60 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #59 Amended Notice of Deposition of Nicolette Horbach, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 29, 2016 Filing 59 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Nicolette Horbach, M.D. on 08/04/2016 at 6:00 p.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 25, 2016 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter in opposition to #51 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - excpts depo Patterson MD, #2 Exhibit B - excpts depo C. Suter, #3 Exhibit C - excpts depo Mann MD, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit Carol Suter, #5 Exhibit E - expert report Hoyte MD, #6 Exhibit F - errata to depo Hoyte MD, #7 Exhibit G - excpts depo Willey MD, #8 Exhibit H - excpts depo Willey MD, #9 Exhibit I - expert report Rosenzweig MD, #10 Exhibit J - excpts depo Azadi MD)(Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC in support of #56 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinion Testimony of Lennox Hoyte, M.D. (Pope, Susan) (Modified on 7/27/2016 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinion Testimony of Lennox Hoyte, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Designation & Disclosure of Experts, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report Dr. Hoyte, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition Excerpts Carol Suter, #4 Exhibit D - Deposition Excerpts Dr. Mann, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - Deposition Excerpts Dr. Azadi, #7 Exhibit G - Deposition Excerpts Dr. Hoyte, #8 Exhibit H - Hutchison Case - Depo Excerpts Dr. Hoyte)(Pope, Susan) (Modified on 7/25/2016 to add party filer)(skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #54 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinion Testimony of Edward N. Willey, M.D. (Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinion Testimony of Edward N. Willey, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Designation & Disclosure of Expert Witnesses, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Dr. Willey, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition Excerpts Carol Suter, #4 Exhibit D - Deposition Excerpts Dr. Mann, #5 Exhibit E - Deposition Excerpts Dr. Azadi, #6 Exhibit F - Deposition Excerpts Dr. Willey, #7 Exhibit G - Deposition Excerpts Dr. Hoyte)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 53 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #48 Notice of Deposition of Nicolette Horbach, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #51 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Pope, Susan) (Modified on 7/17/2016 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Suter, C Dep. excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Patterson Dep. excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Mann Dep. excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Azadi Dep. excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - PFS pages, #6 Exhibit F - FDA Public Health Notification 10-20-08, #7 Exhibit G - FDA Considerations about Surgical Mesh for SUI, #8 Exhibit H - Patterson Dep Ex.09, #9 Exhibit I - Patterson Dep Ex.10, #10 Exhibit J - Hoyte Dep. excerpts, #11 Exhibit K - Willey Dep. excerpts)(Pope, Susan)(Modified on 7/14/2016 to add party filer)(skh) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 50 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #46 Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Juan Felix (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Lennox Hoyte, M.D. on July 2, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 29, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Nicolette Horbach, MD on July 12, 2016 at 9:45 a.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Roger McLendon, MD on June 25, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Juan Felix MD on June 26, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 45 AMENDED NOTICE OF THE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Lennox Hoyte, MD on Jue 30, 2016 at 9:00 am (Attachments: #1 PTO #38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 20, 2016 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter for Revised and Rebuttal Expert Report of Edward Willey, MD. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Designation and Report of Roger McLendon, M.D. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/8/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 3, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Designation and Report of Roger McLendon, M.D. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 3, 2016 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants' Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants' Non-Retained Expert Disclosures (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE OF THE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Lennox Hoyte, M.D. on June 30, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 PTO #38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Edward Willey, M.D. on June 15, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter for Amended Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter for Response to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 36 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEFENDANT'S INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF CAROL SUTER by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Carol Suter (Pope, Susan) (Modified on 5/10/2016 to convert event to stipulation and to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 22, 2016 Filing 34 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF THE VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Danielle M. Mann, M.D. on May 4, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 PTO #38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 14, 2016 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter for Response to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
April 5, 2016 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Carol Suter, First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Troy Suter, Second Requests for Production, and First Set of Requests for Admission (Pope, Susan)(Modified on 4/7/2016 to remove terminated filers) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr Ali Azadi, M.D. on May 19, 2016 at 4:30 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 PTO #38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
February 12, 2016 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Danielle M. Mann, M.D. on April 27, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 PTO #38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Carol Suter (Pope, Susan) (Modified on 2/14/2016 to remove terminated filers) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 26, 2016 Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Troy Suter on March 23, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. (Pope, Susan) Modified on 1/27/2016 to correct party filer (lca). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 26, 2016 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Carol Suter on March 23, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Pope, Susan) Modified on 1/27/2016 to correct party filers (lca). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 21, 2016 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Dr. John M. Patterson on April 13, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 20, 2016 Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of John Patterson, M.D. on April 13, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 PTO #38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 15, 2016 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Danielle Mann, M.D. on April 27, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 PTO 38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 15, 2016 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of John Patterson, M.D. on April 13, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 PTO 38)(Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
January 15, 2016 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Dr. John M. Patterson on April 13, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
December 3, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan J. Pope on behalf of Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Gynecare Worldwide, Johnson & Johnson. (Pope, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Dr. Ali Azadi on March 2, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Dr. Danielle Mann on March 3, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter of Dr. John M. Patterson on March 7, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Danielle Mann on 3/21/16 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Ali Azadi on 3/21/2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of John M. Patterson, M.D. on March 17, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 206 (Docket Control Order - Wave 2 Cases) With the selection of the cases on the attached Exhibit A (Wave 2 cases), it is ORDERED that the following deadlines shall apply in the Ethicon Wave 2 cases as set forth herein: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 1/19/2016; Defendant Fact Sheets due 2/19/2016; Deadline for written discovery requests due 4/05/2016; Expert Disclosure by Plaintiffs due 5/5/2016; Expert Disclosure by Defendants due 6/3/2016; Expert Disclosure for Rebuttal Purposes due 6/17/2016; Deposition Deadline and close of discovery due 7/01/2016; Filing of Dispositive Motions due 7/08/2016; Responses to Dispositive Motions due 7/25/2016; Reply to Response to Dispositive Motions due 8/04/2016; Filing of Daubert Motions due 7/21/2016; Responses to Daubert Motions due 8/08/2016; and Reply to Response to Daubert Motions due 8/18/2016. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: a consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/10/2016, any response is due 6/20/2016, and any reply is due 6/30/2016. By no later than 5/16/2016, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases ready for transfer, remand or trial, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 5/24/2016. Signed by Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/20/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A) (cc: Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 2 Cases) (mnm) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (all) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 28, 2012 Filing 12 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter against Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
August 28, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Defendants Gynecare Worldwide and Ethicon Women's Health and Urology by Carol Ann Suter, Troy W. Suter (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Co.. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 24, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 14, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Co.. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 14, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Co.. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
June 14, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Co.. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 30, 2012 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER #7 (Change of Court Contact Information) entered on 05/16/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 30, 2012 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Troy W. Suter, Carol Ann Suter for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare Worldwide, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for each defendant returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]
May 29, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # CHAR003941. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Receipt) (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suter et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare Worldwide
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy W. Suter
Represented By: Joseph H. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Suter
Represented By: Joseph H. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?