Tomelleri v. Commonwealth of Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: John Doe and Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 3:2019cv00088
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #4 is GRANTED 2. Oliver P. Maguire is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/28/2020. (CBD)cc: COR, Oliver Maguire w/ CM/ECF Reg. Form by US Mail
January 27, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION for Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Tomelleri (CBD)
January 27, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Oliver P. Maguire re #4 MOTION for Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (CBD)
January 27, 2020 Attorney Update. Attorney Oliver P. Maguire for Joseph R. Tomelleri added. (CBD) Modified text on 1/27/2020 (CBD).
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Tomelleri ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4578601) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Attorney, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sparks, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (CBD)
December 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4544140), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Commonwealth of Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Robert R. Sparks
Represented By: Oliver P. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?