Payne v. Midnight Velvet, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Cindy S. Payne
Defendant: Midnight Velvet, Inc. and Equifax Information Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00093
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time #9 is GRANTED. Defendant Midnight Velvet, Inc. shall have up to and including February 25, 2020, to file its responsive pleading to plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/12/2020.(CBD)cc: COR
February 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Zachary Foster re #10 Proposed Agreed Order: Error: the proposed order #10 was incorrectly filed as a separate entry using the event "proposed agreed order." Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of #10 to state "PROPOSED ORDER;" clerk attached the proposed order to the Motion for Extension of Time #9 ; In the future, file the proposed order as an attachment to the motion instead of making a separate entry. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (SCD)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midnight Velvet, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colony Brands, Inc. for Midnight Velvet, Inc... (Foster, Zachary)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Order re #9 Motion by Midnight Velvet, Inc.. (Foster, Zachary) Modified on 2/11/2020 (SCD).
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Midnight Velvet, Inc. (Foster, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (SCD).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 is GRANTED. 2. Zachary S. Foster is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Midnight Velvet, Inc. in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/7/2020. (CBD)cc: COR, Zachary S. Foster w/ copy of CM/ECF Form via US Mail
February 5, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #7 MOTION for Zachary S. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Midnight Velvet, Inc. (SCD)
February 5, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Zachary S. Foster re #7 MOTION for Zachary S. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Midnight Velvet, Inc.. (SCD)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Zachary S. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Midnight Velvet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt No. 3002170, #4 Cover Letter)(SCD)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Midnight Velvet, Inc. COMPLETED on 2/3/2020. Secretary of State return states: WE are enclosing the return receipt confirming receipt of summons. (CBD)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued as to Midnight Velvet, Inc. (CBD)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Midnight Velvet, Inc.; Summons issued and returned with a service packet to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Kentucky Secretary of State. (CBD)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Service, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (CBD)
December 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4549065), filed by Cindy S. Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Midnight Velvet, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midnight Velvet, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy S. Payne
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?