Morris v. Charter Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth Morris
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR
January 16, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Answer to Complaint (SCD)
January 15, 2020 Clerk's Note re #4 Notice to Attorney Briana Lathom: Clerk rec'd application for admission 1/15/2020. Counsel may disregard the Attorney Notice. (CBD)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Charter Communications, LLC.(Halliday, Culver)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Briana Lathon by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD)
January 9, 2020 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charter Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, LLC. (CBD)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Trimble Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00165, filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4563150) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Charter Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Briana Lathon
Represented By: Culver V. Halliday
Represented By: Briana N. Lathon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Morris
Represented By: David B. Mour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?