Pack v. Friedlander et al
Plaintiff: Oliver Pack
Defendant: Wendy Morris, Lisa Lee and Eric Friedlander
Case Number: 3:2020cv00042
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Appearance of Catherine Elaine York is WITHDRAWN and electronic notifications of filing to Ms. York are hereby TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 7/24/2020. (SCD)cc: COR
July 24, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #9 MOTION to Withdraw Catherine York as Attorney by Eric Friedlander, Lisa Lee, Wendy Morris (SCD)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw Catherine York as Attorney by Eric Friedlander, Lisa Lee, Wendy Morris (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(York, Catherine) Modified on 7/24/2020 (SCD).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Joint Motion #7 is GRANTED IN PART; 2. Defendants shall have an additional thirty (30) days to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 and Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 ; and 3. The Court has not yet ordered the parties to engage in a Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Therefore, the motion is premature, and is therefore DENIED with respect to the Rule 26(f) meeting deadline. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/6/2020.(CBD)cc: COR
June 23, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #7 JOINT MOTION Joint Motion to Hold in Abeyance by Eric Friedlander, Lisa Lee, Wendy Morris and Oliver Pack (CBD)
June 23, 2020 Attorney Update. Attorney Shaun T. Orme for Eric Friedlander,Shaun T. Orme for Lisa Lee,Shaun T. Orme for Wendy Morris added. (CBD)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION Joint Motion to Hold in Abeyance by Eric Friedlander, Lisa Lee, Wendy Morris and Oliver Pack (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Hold in Abeyance)(York, Catherine)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING Corrected Certificate of Service showing service via US Mail by Oliver Pack re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Oliver Pack and MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Dolan, William) Modified text on 6/2/2020 (CBD).
June 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO William Dolan re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Error 1: MOTION for Preliminary; Error: This motion requests 2 forms of relief and only one form of relief was selected; Entry by attorney; Clerk added the additional motion relief requested. In the future, when filing a motion with multiple reliefs, select a motion relief for each relief requested, so all motions will appear on the Judge's motion report. No further action required by counsel. Error 2: Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (CBD)
June 2, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Oliver Pack (CBD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Oliver Pack (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Application, #3 Exhibit B - Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Request, #5 Exhibit D - Notice, #6 Exhibit E - Jones v. Commonwealth of Ky, 12-C1-01237, Franklin Circuit Ct. (2013), #7 Proposed Order)(Dolan, William). Added adtl Motion relief on 6/2/2020 (CBD). See DE #6 for CORRECTED Certificate of Service. Modified on 6/2/2020 (CBD).
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; Incorrect Summons image uploaded re #1 Complaint; Corrected document attached to this entry. cc: COR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Request, #4 Exhibit D - Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(CBD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eric Friedlander, Lisa Lee, Wendy Morris; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (CBD)
June 1, 2020 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4682926), filed by Oliver Pack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Request, #4 Exhibit D - Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(CBD) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (CBD). (Attachment 6 replaced on 6/1/2020) (CBD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pack v. Friedlander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Pack
Represented By: Heidi Schissler Lanham
Represented By: William Stewart Dolan
Represented By: Leslie Ann Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Morris
Represented By: Catherine Elaine York
Represented By: Shaun T. Orme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Lee
Represented By: Catherine Elaine York
Represented By: Shaun T. Orme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Friedlander
Represented By: Catherine Elaine York
Represented By: Shaun T. Orme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?