Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC et al v. MidCap Funding IV Trust et al
Plaintiff: Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC, Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC, Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC, Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC, St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC and Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC
Defendant: St. Matthew's Leasing, LLC, Eli M. Gunzburg, Vanceburg Leasing, LLC, Redwood Holdings, LLC, Redwood Healthcare Management, Inc., Camelot Leasing, LLC, Green Hill Leasing, LLC, Mt. Holly Leasing, LLC, Hillcreek Leasing, LLC, Providence Healthcare Management, Inc., Frankfort Leasing, LLC, Kirtland Leasing, LLC and Stanford Leasing, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MidCap Financial Services, LLC and MidCap Funding IV Trust
Case Number: 3:2020cv00059
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Andrew Warth re #24 Third Party Complaint; Error: 1 Party name incorrectly added to case/database as Gunzberg Eli M.; Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk corrected name in the case/database as Eli M. Gunzberg. Error 2: Party Eli M. Gunzberg was added as both a Defendant and Third Party Defendant. Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk terminated Eli M. Gunzberg as a party defendant. No further action required. cc: COR (CBD)
September 23, 2020 Incorrectly added Party Eli M. Gunzburg terminated in the participant role of defendant. (CBD)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Camelot Leasing, LLC, Frankfort Leasing, LLC, Green Hill Leasing, LLC, Eli M. Gunzburg, Hillcreek Leasing, LLC, Kirtland Leasing, LLC, Mt. Holly Leasing, LLC, Providence Healthcare Management, Inc., Redwood Healthcare Management, Inc., Redwood Holdings, LLC, St. Matthew's Leasing, LLC, Stanford Leasing, LLC, Vanceburg Leasing, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (CBD)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust re #24 Third Party Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Camelot Leasing, LLC, #2 Summons Eli Gunzberg, an individual, #3 Summons Frankfort Leasing, LLC, #4 Summons Green Hill Leasing, LLC, #5 Summons Hillcreek Leasing, LLC, #6 Summons Kirtland Leasing, LLC, #7 Summons Mt. Holly Leasing, LLC, #8 Summons Providence Healthcare Management, Inc., #9 Summons Redwood Healthcare Management, Inc., #10 Summons Redwood Holdings, LLC, #11 Summons St. Matthews Leasing, LLC, #12 Summons Stanford Leasing, LLC, #13 Summons Vanceburg Leasing, LLC)(Warth, Andrew)
September 22, 2020 Filing 24 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Redwood Holdings, LLC, Camelot Leasing, LLC, Frankfort Leasing, LLC, Green Hill Leasing, LLC, Hillcreek Leasing, LLC, Kirtland Leasing, LLC, Mt. Holly Leasing, LLC, Providence Healthcare Management, Inc., Redwood Healthcare Management, Inc., St. Matthew's Leasing, LLC, Stanford Leasing, LLC, Vanceburg Leasing, LLC, Gunzburg M. Eli, filed by MidCap Funding IV Trust, MidCap Financial Services, LLC.(Warth, Andrew)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: 1) NLT 30 days from the date of entry and service of this order, parties shall meet. 2) At the time of the meeting, parties shall exchange disclosures. 3) NLT 10 days after the meeting, parties shall file a joint written report. 4) Directed to advise Court of all parent corporations. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(SCD)cc: COR
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1) #20 Motion for Andrew A. Warth to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. 2) Andrew A. Warth is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/9/2020. (SCD)cc: COR and Andrew A. Warth by US Mail w ECF Registration form
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: 1) #19 Motion for Kathleen G. Stenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. 2) Kathleen G. Stenberg is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/9/2020. (SCD)cc: COR and Kathleen G. Stenberg by US Mail w ECF Registration form
September 9, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #1 Complaint and #18 Answer to Complaint (SCD)
September 9, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #19 MOTION for Kathleen G. Stenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and, #20 MOTION for Andrew Warth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust (SCD)
September 9, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Andrew A. Warth re #20 MOTION for Andrew Warth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust. (SCD)
September 9, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kathleen G. Stenberg re #19 MOTION for Kathleen G. Stenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust. (SCD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Andrew Warth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4770128) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Graham, Stanley)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Kathleen G. Stenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4770122) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Graham, Stanley)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust.(Graham, Stanley)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust identifying Corporate Parent MidCap Financial Intermediate Holdings Trust, Other Affiliate MidCap FinCo Designated Activity Company, Other Affiliate Athene Holding, Ltd., Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, Inc. for MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust.. (Graham, Stanley)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust. (Graham, Stanley)
September 8, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #14 Summons Returned, #15 Summons Returned; Error: Incorrect event used by clerk. Entry by docket clerk. Correction: Clerk has modified the docket text to reflect service was completed by Secretary of State on 9/4/2020. No action required by counsel. cc: COR (SCD)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED by Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC, Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC, Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC, Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC, St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC, Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to MidCap Funding IV Trust on 9/4/2020. (SCD) Modified on 9/8/2020 (SCD).
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED by Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC, Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC, Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC, Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC, St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC, Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to MidCap Financial Services, LLC COMPLETED on 9/4/2020. (SCD) Modified on 9/8/2020 (SCD).
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #3 Summons Issued: Received by Secretary of State on 8/11/2020. (SCD)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Medical Rehabilitation Centers, LLC for Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC.. (Thomerson, James)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James L. Thomerson. #1 Complaint has been filed by Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC, Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC, Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC, Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC, St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC, Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MidCap Financial Services, LLC, MidCap Funding IV Trust; Summons issued and returned to counsel (with packet) by UPS for service by Secretary of State. (SCD) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SCD). (1ZE10F290391646994)
August 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SCD)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief filed by Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC, Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC, Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC, Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC, St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC, Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC, Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4738816) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hardship Letters, #2 Summons to be issued for MidCap Funding, #3 Summons to be issued for MidCap Financial, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCD) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SCD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC et al v. MidCap Funding IV Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillcreek Rehab and Care, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Woods Care and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Hill Rehab and Care, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Care and Rehab, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Matthews Care and Rehab Center, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Oaks Care and Rehab Center, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankfort Rehab and Care, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanceburg Rehab and Care, LLC
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Thomerson
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MidCap Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Represented By: Kathleen G. Stenberg
Represented By: Stanley E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MidCap Funding IV Trust
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Represented By: Kathleen G. Stenberg
Represented By: Stanley E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Matthew's Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli M. Gunzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanceburg Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood Healthcare Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camelot Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Hill Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Holly Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillcreek Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Healthcare Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankfort Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirtland Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?