Whittamore v. PM4 Petroleum, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Whittamore
Defendant: Bhupendra Patel, PM4 Petroleum, Inc. and Mayur Patel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00060
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by PM4 Petroleum, Inc., Bhupendra Patel, Mayur Patel, David Whittamore, #8 MOTION for Nader George Shunnarah to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Whittamore (JJ)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by PM4 Petroleum, Inc., Bhupendra Patel, Mayur Patel, David Whittamore (JJ) Modified link/text on 9/28/2020 (JJ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by PM4 Petroleum, Inc., Bhupendra Patel, Mayur Patel filed by David Whittamore. (JJ)
September 28, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Nader George Shunnarah re #8 MOTION for Nader George Shunnarah to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Whittamore. (JJ)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Nader George Shunnarah to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Whittamore (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 KY Bar Check, #3 IN Annual Registration Report, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Receipt)(JJ)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by PM4 Petroleum, Inc., Bhupendra Patel, Mayur Patel (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Kimberly)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: motion #5 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including Monday, August 31, 2020, to file their answers or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/10/2020. (CBD)cc: COR, Nader George Shunnarah by US Mail. Modified cc on 8/10/2020 (CBD).
August 6, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order (CBD)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by PM4 Petroleum, Inc., Bhupendra Patel, Mayur Patel. (O'Donnell, Kimberly) Modified on 8/6/2020 (CBD).
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PM4 Petroleum, Inc., Bhupendra Patel, Mayur Patel. (Marcus, Aaron)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Aaron Marcus. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by PM4 Petroleum, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD)
August 4, 2020 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00097( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4740089), filed by Mayur Patel, PM4 Petroleum, Inc., Bhupendra Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Notice of Filing NOR)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittamore v. PM4 Petroleum, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhupendra Patel
Represented By: Kimberly J. O'Donnell
Represented By: Aaron W. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PM4 Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly J. O'Donnell
Represented By: Aaron W. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayur Patel
Represented By: Kimberly J. O'Donnell
Represented By: Aaron W. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whittamore
Represented By: Nader George Shunnarah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?