Bluegrass Land Title, LLC v. Fletcher, et al.
Plaintiff: Bluegrass Land Title, LLC
Defendant: Vikita Fletcher, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Brittney Hagood and Glen Earl Hagood
Case Number: 3:2020cv00068
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #9 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC (CBD)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Deed, #2 Exhibit State Court Order Contempt, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Default Judgment)(Dieffenbach, Richard)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT - Affidavit of John Williams re Motion #11 for Default Judgment. Sealed pursuant to MOTION TO SEAL re #9 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC (Dieffenbach, Richard) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (CBD).
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dieffenbach, Richard)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vikita Fletcher, Brittney Hagood, Glen Earl Hagood re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC , #7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC and Renewed Entry Default Hagood cc: COR (JJ)
October 19, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert R. Carr, Clerk of the Court for review: #7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC and Renewed Entry Default Hagood, #5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC (JJ)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC and Renewed Entry Default Hagood Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Dieffenbach Renewed, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Entry of Default)(Dieffenbach, Richard)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Christopher M. Barber by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Routing Form)(JJ)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dieffenbach affidavit w exhibits, #2 Proposed Order proposed order)(Dieffenbach, Richard)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bluegrass Land Title, LLC for Bluegrass Land Title, LLC.. (Dieffenbach, Richard)
September 22, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Please see docket entery #1 -1 for pdf of document. (JJ)
September 22, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vikita Fletcher, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Bluegrass Land Title, LLC. Please see docket entry #1 -1 for pdf of document.(JJ)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (JJ)
September 22, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00681. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4780645), filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Emails, #3 Exhibit C - Noticce of Removal (State Court), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluegrass Land Title, LLC v. Fletcher, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluegrass Land Title, LLC
Represented By: Richard Jacob Dieffenbach
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: Christopher M. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikita Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kristin Ellen McCall
Represented By: Dustin E. Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Hagood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Earl Hagood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?