Russell, KY et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: City of Russell, KY, City of Jenkins, KY, City of Pineville, KY, City of Worthington, KY, City of Vanceburg, KY, City of Greenup, KY, City of South Shore, KY and City of Bellefonte, KY
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan plc, Endo International PLC, Johnson & Johnson, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., KVK Tech, Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Depomed Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kroger Company, McKesson Corporation, Rite Aid Corporation, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreens Corporation and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00030
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Clerk's Note: JPMDL information extracted re #17 Case Transferred to MDL and electronically transmitted to AO. (SKV)
August 11, 2021 Clerk's Note re #17 Case Transferred to MDL: has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:21-op-45094, filed 08/11/2021. (CBD) Modified txt on 8/11/2021 (CBD).
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 201 filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (JJ)cc: COR
August 10, 2021 Clerk's Note re #17 Case Transferred to MDL: Case extracted and electronically transmitted to the USDC/OHND via CM/ECF.) (CBD)
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER 201 re MDL No. 2804 (CBD)
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTCorporate Disclosure by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Cobb, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER : 1. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint #10 is GRANTED; 2.West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., now known as Hika Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s Motion to Join Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #12 is GRANTED; and 3. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint within thirty days after the later of: (a) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this case; or (b) a final decision from the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation on whether to transfer this action to In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, No. 1:17-md-280. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/30/2021.(CBD)cc: COR
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Joinder #10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Donald)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dickens, Scott)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stopher, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp... (Kelly, Donald)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (White, Jordan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Kelly, Donald)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Moad, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by McKesson Corporation. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moad, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Stopher, Robert) Modified text on 7/28/2021 (JJ).
July 27, 2021 Clerk's Note re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel and SKV notified via email with a copy of the Notice of Removal and docket sheet. (JJ)
July 26, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Co. Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00515. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5025535), filed by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(JJ)
July 23, 2021 STIPULATION in State Court Record to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. PDF document available at DE #1 -2. (JJ)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell, KY et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Russell, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Jenkins, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pineville, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Worthington, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Vanceburg, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Greenup, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of South Shore, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Bellefonte, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Breaux Ballard Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Earl Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Bandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John David Dyche
Represented By: Scott T. Dickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Allan Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation LLC
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Edmund J. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Carolyn Purcell Michener
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Moad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Corporation
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Louis Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?