Myrnarski v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Adam Myrnarski
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv00075
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand by Adam Myrnarski filed by Adam Myrnarski. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
December 11, 2023 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #6 MOTION to Remand by Adam Myrnarski (CBD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand by Adam Myrnarski filed by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Denaro, #2 Proposed Order) Filed pursuant to QC re #9 (CBD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 INCORRECTLY FILED FIRST MOTION to Remand by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Denaro Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Remand)(Tapp, Katherine)See DE #10 for CORRECTED entry of this pleading Modified on 11/27/2023 (CBD).
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Tapp, Katherine)
November 27, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Katherine Tapp re #9 FIRST MOTION. Attorney having advised clerk the response was incorrectly filed the with the event "Motion." Clerk modified the docket text of #9 to state, "incorrectly filed," and re-filed the response as #10 for purpose of appearing on the Judge's motion report. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (CBD)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Parties' Agreed Order [R. #5 ] is GRANTED; 2. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time [R. #4 ] is HELD IN ABEYANCE; 3. If necessary, Plaintiff SHALL file a Response to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time [R. #4 ] within seven days of the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand [R. #6 .]. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 11/14/2023. (JJ)cc: COR
November 8, 2023 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #5 Proposed Agreed Order by Adam Myrnarski (JJ)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Adam Myrnarski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Summons, #2 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order by Adam Myrnarski. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: E-Mails Between Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Edward)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.. (CBD)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-197. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5687766), filed by First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Record - Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Record - Amended Complaint, #4 State Court Record Service Documents, #5 LTD Policy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)
November 1, 2023 AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, filed by Adam Myrnarski.(CBD)
November 1, 2023 Conflict Check run. (CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myrnarski v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Myrnarski
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Represented By: Katherine E. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?