Gundaker/Jordan American Holdings, Inc. v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Gundaker/Jordan American Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Charles R. Clark, A. J. Elko, John 1-99 Does, Wendell Johnson and The Lamb Foundation
Counter_claimant: Charles R. Clark
Counter_defendant: Gundaker/Jordan American Holdings, Inc.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: The Lamb Foundation and Wendell Johnson
Thirdparty_defendant: W. Neal Jordan
Case Number: 5:2004cv00226
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B Coffman
Presiding Judge: James B Todd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 382 MOTION to Alter 379 Amended Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiff need not file a response to that motion. Due to the time-sensitive nature of the Lamb Foundation's 383 Motion for Approval o f Supersedeas Bond and Stay of Execution of the Amended Judgment, IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file its Response NLT 8/18/2009 and the Lamb Foundation shall file its Reply NLT 8/20/2009. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on August 14, 2009. (AWD) cc: COR
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 323 and 326 motions of Charles R. Clark and A.J. Elko for judgment as a matter of law, for a new trial, or for remittitur, and for a mistrial are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The mo tions are granted to the extend that they seek a judgment as a matter of law on punitive damages. On all other issues, they are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 331 motion of Charles R. Clark's to set aside, alter and amend judg ment, and for judgment as a matter of law, for a new trial, or for remittitur, and for a mistrial is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted in regard to punitive damages and to the extend that it is requests a judgment by the cour t, not the clerk. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Lamb Foundation's 325 renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law is DENIED, and its 336 motion to alter or amend judgment by remittitur of damages is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted to the extend that it requests a judgment entered by the court, not the clerk. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 335 motion to set aside judgment in favor of proposed judgment of Plaintiff is GRANT ED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The court will enter an amended judgment that provides for post-judgment interest, but it will not impose joint and several liability for compensatory damages. The court declines to adopt the Plaintiff's proposed judgment because it does not fully incorporate the rulings contained in this memorandum opinion and order. A separate, amended judgment will issue in accordance with this memorandum opinion and order. Signed by Judge Jennifer B. Coffman on August 3, 2009. (AWD) cc: COR
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The 327 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by The Lamb Foundation is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer B. Coffman on June 26, 2009. (AWD) cc: COR
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Lamb Foundation's 328 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction is DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 364 and 367 Motions to Strike are DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 348 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on June 22, 2009. (AWD) cc: COR
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER (1) the motion of the Lamb Foundation and Johnston to reconsider the court's order denying their motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction 257 is DENIED; and (2) the motion of the Lamb Foundation and Johnston to reconsider the court's order denying their motion for summary judgment 256 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 10/13/08.(JMW)cc: COR
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that pla's 249 MOTION to Adopting Plaintiff's Legal Claims and Jury Instructions is DENIED; It is further ordered that the clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the Hon. Jack Conway, Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 10/9/2008.(SCD)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gundaker/Jordan American Holdings, Inc. v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gundaker/Jordan American Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Clark
Represented By: Frank T. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. J. Elko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-99 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Johnson
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lamb Foundation
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Charles R. Clark
Represented By: Frank T. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gundaker/Jordan American Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: The Lamb Foundation
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Wendell Johnson
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: W. Neal Jordan
Represented By: Christopher A. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?