West Hills Farms, LLC v. ClassicStar, LLC et al
Case Number: 5:2006cv00243
Filed: July 28, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph M. Hood
Presiding Judge: James B Todd
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 897 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court DENIES (894) Motion to Quash in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW; (2623) Motion to Quash in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW for want of jurisdiction, but provides merits analysis for the reasons stated. The matter is ap pealable to Judge Hood. A party objecting must file same within 14 days of Order entry. Failure to object waives a party's right to review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier on 1/3/2017. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW(STC)cc: COR
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 885 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) (2587 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 866 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW) MOTION Motion For Declaration That Certain Property (1) Is Owned By Judgment Debtor John Parrott Or (2) Was Fraudulently Transferred By Judgment is DENIED; (2) (2597 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 875 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW) MOTION to Continue and extend time to file Reply to obtain further evidence in support of motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/29/2016.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW(STC)cc: COR
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 821 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Dfts Geostar Corporation, Ferguson, and Robinson's Emergency Motion to Vacate Temporary Injunction or, in the Alternative, Stay the Temporary Injunction and Hearing (818) in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, (2528) in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW[DE 818] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; (2) That paragraphs 1, 2, and 3 of the Court's August 16, 2013, Order, (816) in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, are VACATED; (3) That all post-judgment discovery disputes in this matter are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier for all necessary proceedings and orders for resolution. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/23/2013. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW(STC)cc: COR
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 798 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plas' Motion for Sanctions and the Motion to Join that Motion for Sanctions are GRANTED as set forth below. 2) That GeoStar Corporation is precluded from disputing the authenticity of documents appearing to have b een created or received by GeoStar or its agents. 3) That the testimony offered by GeoStar Corporation's designee may be used by any party only insofar as it contains admissions against GeoStar itself and as offered against GeoStar. 4) GeoStar C orporation is estopped from denying the assertions set forth by Plas and other parties to this motion in paragraphs (a) through (s) of Pla's Memo in Support of its Motion for Sanctions and paragraphs (1) through (13) in the Memo in Support of th e Joinder in Plas' Motion. 5) Motions as filed in 09-cv-15 (DE 76 and 78 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. 6) Plummer parties' Motion is STRICKEN from 09-cv-167 (DE 14 ) as it appears that the parties did not intend to file the motion in that individual case. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(SCD)cc: COR
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 795 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Defendants' (769 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 2353 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION to Alter Judgment by John Parrot,(2352 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 768 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW) MOTION to Alter Judgment by Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation, Thom Robinson, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; (2) Plaintiffs' (772 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 2357 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Judgment by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonal d Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC Entry of Rule 54(B) Certification GRANTED; (3) Court's earlier statement in Amended JGM of 11/8/2011 that jgm in favor of plts on claims was final and appealable is STRICKEN AND H ELD FOR NAUGHT; Order of JGM to be entered separately; (4) Clerk shall return to active docket w/ respect to cross claims of Dfts; (5) w/in 10 days, parties to cross claims shall file briefs re (a) intent to pursue cross claims; (b) if cross claims now moot; (c) whether cross claims ready for JURY TRIAL on 6/5/2012 and length of trial. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/30/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR,D,JC
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plts' (761 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW, 2324 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) MOTION for Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(a) GRANTED; (2) JGM entered 10/11/2011 is STRICKEN AND HELD FOR NAUGHT; (3) separate order of jgm shall issue. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/8/2011.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW(STB)cc: COR
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 757 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plts' Mtn to Substitute Certain Exhibits inSupport of their Summary Judgment Pleadings (1925 in 5:07-cv-353; 565 in 5:06-cv-243) GRANTED; Clerk shall SUBSTITUTE tendered exhibits as necessary; (2) Dfts' Moti on for Leave to File Excess Pages (1802 in 5:07-cv-353; 515 in 5:06-cv-243) GRANTED; Clerk shall FILE tendered document in record; (3) Motions of Plts for Leave to File Excess Pages (1869, 1870, 1896 in 5:07-cv-353; 535, 536, 555 in 5:06-cv-243) GRAN TED; Clerk shall FILE tendered docs in record; (4) Dfts Motion for Briefing (2270 in 5:07-cv-353; 744 in 5:06-cv-243) DENIED; (5) Mtn for Summary Judgment of Plts (1698 in 5:07-cv-353; 482 in 5:06-cv-243) DENIED AS MOOT as to dft James D. Lyon in his capacity as Trustee; (6) Mtn for Summary Judgment of Plts (1698 in 5:07-cv-353; 482 in 5:06-cv-243) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/30/2011.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW(STB)cc: COR
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Dfts' (203) Motion to Dismiss; (204) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW; (97) Motion to Dismiss; (106) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:07-cv-353 DENIED AS MOOT; (2) Plummer Dfts' (313) Motion to D ismiss in case 5:06-cv-243; (816) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:07-cv-353 DENIED; (3) GeoStar Dfts' (319) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:06-cv-243; (843) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; (4) Plts' claims which seek to impose liability on Dfts Parrott and Robinson for negligent misrepresentation shall be DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/15/2011. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW(STB)cc: COR
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 1014 in 07-353 and 198 in 08-53 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED; 2) 1015 Duplicate Motion for Joinder is DENIED AS MOOT; 3) Dft GeoStar Corporation's 1005 in 07-353 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN P ART and DENIED IN PART; 4) GeoStar shall have no obligations to provide a designee informed of GeoStar's current financial condition and the current location of its assets; 5) This order does not relieve GeoStar of any other discovery obligations. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/12/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) 276 MOTION for Protective Order by Geostar Corp. is DENIED; (2) West Hills Plts shall bear reasonable cost to GeoStar of copying & delivering data to counsel for West Hills; (3) By 2/12/2009, GeoStar shall provide We st Hills good-faith estimate of reasonable cost of copying & delivering data; (4) By 2/17/2009, West Hills shall notify GeoStar whether it wishes GeoStar to proceed to produce data based on estimate; (5) GeoStar shall PRODUCE requested financial data in native format to West Hills by 3/4/2009; (6) GeoStar shall be relieved of obligation to timely produce data only if West Hills advise GeoStar they do not wish to proceed w/ production as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 2/2/2009.(STB)cc: COR
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, (1) 255 FIRST MOTION to Intervene by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America and for Interpleader is DENIED; (2) 256 FIRST MOTION to Deposit Funds by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/22/2009.(STB)cc: COR
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Clerk shall file Mtn for Reconsideration in 08-17, 08-18, 08-60, 08-74, 08-79, 08-104, 08-373, 08-418, 08-487 & 08-496; (2) 290 MOTION for Reconsideration re 285 Order, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/23/2008.(STB)cc: COR
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Request by Plts Goyak to strike certain proposed orders is DENIED: (2) Plt West Hills' 239 Mtn for Status Conference is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) Geostar's 243 Mtn for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DE NIED AS MOOT IN PART; (4) depos of Dfts Ferguson, Parrott & Robinson not scheduled prior to 12/1/2008; (5) Dfts Ferguson, Parrott & Robinson not required to respond to interrogatories or requests for admission prior to 12/1/2008, but shall serve responses to all timely served discovery requests by 12/1/2008; (6) that all other permitted discovery shall proceed unless otherwise made subject of an order of this Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/28/2008.(STB)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Hills Farms, LLC v. ClassicStar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?